Easley v. County of El Dorado Probation Department et al
Plaintiff: |
Gary D. Easley |
Defendant: |
County of El Dorado Probation Department, Mike Cook, Rich Horn, El Dorado District Attorney's Office, Vern Pierson and California Bar Association |
Case Number: |
2:2008cv01432 |
Filed: |
June 23, 2008 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Civil Rights: Other Office |
County: |
El Dorado |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Presiding Judge: |
Morrison C. England |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 12, 2011 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/11/11 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court send pltf a copy of the 48 10/21/10 hearing transcript. (Manzer, C)
|
November 3, 2010 |
Filing
34
ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/2/10 ORDERING that the moving defendants' Amended Request for Judicial Notice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that The Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff 39;s Third Amended Complaint 23 be granted. All claims alleged in Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint be Dismissed with prejudice. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Within fourteen days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections with the Court and serve on all parties. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
September 9, 2010 |
Filing
26
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/8/10, ORDERING that pltf's ex parte motion for an ext of time 24 is GRANTED IN PART. The hearing on the motion to dismiss 23 is hereby CONT'D for 10/21/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroo m 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Pltf's opposition or non-opposition to the motion to dismiss shall be filed and served on or before 10/7/10, and dfts may file a reply to pltf's opposition, if any, on or before 10/14/10. (Kastilahn, A)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/21/10 ORDERING that Service of plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint is appropriate for: Co of El Dorado, El Dorado Co Sheriff's Dept, El Dorado Co Probation Dept, Mike Cook, Richard Hor n, Hal Barker, Olga Hopkins, Jeff Neves and Nolan Tracy; The Clerk shall send plaintiff 9 USM-285 forms, 1 summons, an endorsed copy of the Third Amended Complaint 16 and, this court's scheduling order, and a consent form; and Plaintiff shall supply the US Marshal, within 30 days, all information needed by the US Marshal to effectuate service of process, and file a statement that such documents have been submitted to the US Marshal; The US Marshal shall serve process, within 90 days without prepayment of costs; The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the USM. (cc USM) (Becknal, R)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?