United States of America v. La Perle et al
Plaintiff: |
United States of America |
Defendant: |
Stephen La Perle, Alice La Perle and State of California Department of Veterans Affairs |
Case Number: |
2:2008cv02073 |
Filed: |
September 4, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Taxes Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Mendez |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly J. Mueller |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
U.S. Government Plaintiff |
Jury Demanded By: |
26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 7, 2011 |
Filing
36
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 01/06/11 GRANTING 30 Motion for Confirmation of Sale and Distribution of Proceeds; ORDERING the sale of the Property is confirmed; ORDERING that on delivery of the deed to the purchaser, all interests in, lie ns against, or claims to the Property that are held or asserted by that plaintiff or any of the defendants in this action are discharged; ORDERING that the Clerk shall disburse the proceeds of the sale from the Courts registry as stated. (cc: sacramento financial)(Williams, D)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing
29
ORDER OF JUDICIAL SALE signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 03/30/10 (cc: Financial, USM). (Benson, A.)
|
October 5, 2009 |
Filing
22
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/5/09 RECOMMENDING that the United States' Motion for Default Judgment against Stephen La Perle and Alice La Perle be GRANTED; that judgment be entered in favor of the United States and against Stephen R. La Perle in the amount of $280,566.81, plus interest and other statutory additions, as provided by law, accruing after 8/6/09; and that Alice La Perle be deemed to have no interest in the Subject Property , that title to the subject property is deemed to be in Stephen La Perle alone, and that judgment be entered in favor of the United States and against Alice La Perle aka Alice Linn K-Lopez; and that the United States' federal tax liens encumbering the Subject Property be foreclosed, and the Subject Property be sold pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2001. (Becknal, R)
|
July 23, 2009 |
Filing
18
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/23/2009 GRANTING 17 Stipulation and Proposed Order for Dismissal of the State of California Department of Veterans Affairs; State of California Department of Veterans Affairs terminated. (Matson, R)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?