Wilson v. First Franklin Financial Corp.

Plaintiff: Beverly J Wilson
Defendant: First Franklin Financial Corp.
Case Number: 2:2008cv02572
Filed: October 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 11/29/2010 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 76 are ADOPTED in FULL; Plaintiff's second amended complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 28:1367(c); Defendants' 54 motion to dismiss is DENIED; and Defendants' 56 motion to strike is DENIED. (Reader, L)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER and FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/2/10 ORDERING that the November 4, 2010 hearing onthis matter is VACATED. It is RECOMMENDED that without prejudice. plt's 52 second amended complaint be dismissed. Defendants' 54 motion to dismiss be denied and Defendants' 56 motion to strike be denied. Objections due within ten days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Duong, D)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/30/10 ORDERING the hearing on dfts' Motion to Dismiss 54 and Motion to Strike 56 is CONTINUED to 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr..; pltf's counsel is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why she should not be sanctioned in the amount of $150 for failing to file an opposition or non-opposition to dfts' motions in compliance with LR 230(c). (Carlos, K)(Carlos, K)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 5/25/10: 43 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff is granted fifteen (15) days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint in accordance with this order. Defendant is granted thirty (30) days from the date of service of plaintiff's second amended complaint to file a response thereto. (Kaminski, H)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/26/10 ORDERING that 27 Findings and Recommendations are VACATED; Defendant's 14 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice; Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint; this matter is referred back to District Judge Frank C. Damrell; all documents shall bear case number 2:08-cv-2572 FCD JFM. (Owen, K)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/4/09 ORDERING that 15 Motion to Strike is DENIED without prejudice; 22 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. It is RECOMMENDED that 14 Motion to Dismiss be gr anted; pltfs 1 Claim for fraud be dismissed without prejudice to its filing in state court and that all other claims be dismissed with prejudice. Motion referred to District Judge Frank C. Damrell. Objections due within 10 days.(Owen, K) Modified on 11/6/2009 (Owen, K).
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve within 10 days the summons, complaint and order on First Franklin Financial Corp signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 01/05/09. (cc:USM) (Manzer, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. First Franklin Financial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly J Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Franklin Financial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?