September 30, 2021 |
Filing
317
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/30/21 ORDERING that the Court GRANTS the disbursement of the remaining class funds in the amount of $8,766.85 to the appropriate cy pres designee, the Institute for Consumer Antitrust Studies at Loyola University Chicago School of Law. The Court DISMISSES on the merits and with prejudice the remaining causes of action against SK Foods, L.P. and Scott Salyer. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
|
November 6, 2020 |
Filing
303
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/5/2020 GRANTING 298 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Malcolm S. Segal terminated. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 30, 2020 |
Filing
299
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/30/2020 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 12/10/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Coll, A)
|
March 2, 2020 |
Filing
293
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/28/2020 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 9/24/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, to address the status of the distributions to the Class and the closing of this action. (Huang, H)
|
June 5, 2018 |
Filing
279
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/4/2018 CONTINUING Status Conference for 9 months to address status of the potential distributions from the bankruptcy proceedings. Status Conference RESET for 3/14/2019, at 02:30 PM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (York, M)
|
August 7, 2017 |
Filing
272
FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER dated *8/7/2017* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/7/2017 as to Defendants Ingomar Packing Company, Greg Pruett, Los Gatos Tomato Products and StuartWoolf. (Washington, S)
|
May 10, 2016 |
Filing
268
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/10/2016 ORDERING that the 5/12/2016 status conference is CONTINUED for one year until 5/11/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Zignago, K.)
|
November 12, 2015 |
Filing
266
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/10/2015 ORDERING that, pursuant to the 264 stipulation, Class Counsel shall arrange for the immediate pro rata distribution of the Escrow Account Funds to the Class members by the claims administrator under the plan of allocation approved by this court. The 11/12/2015 status conference is CONTINUED to 5/12/2016 in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Zignago, K.)
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing
261
STIPULATION and ORDER 260 for distribution of bankruptcy funds to class signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/23/2015. Class Counsel will hold the funds from the initial April 2015 bankruptcy distribution to the Class in an escrow account until such time as future distributions by the Chapter 11 Trustee have been made or the Trustee provides notification that there will be no further distributions. At that time, Class Counsel will arrange for pro rata distribution of funds to the Class members by the claims administrator under the plan of allocation approved by this Court, subject to fees and reimbursement of expenses awarded to Class Counsel by the bankruptcy court. (Marciel, M)
|
October 8, 2014 |
Filing
252
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/7/14 ORDERING that a Further Status Conference is SET for 4/2/2015 in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
August 18, 2014 |
Filing
239
AMENDED ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/15/14 re 238 Order. (Meuleman, A)
|
August 14, 2014 |
Filing
238
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/13/2014 GRANTING plaintiffs' 233 Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement as follows: Solely for the purpose of the two settlements and based on Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23, the court hereby certifies the following class: All persons and entities that purchased tomato paste, tomato sauce, diced tomatoes or any other processed tomato product ("Processed Tomato Products") directly from Ingomar Packing Company, Los Gatos Tomato Products, or SK Foods, L.P. (collectively"Defendants") where the purchase was made pursuant to a contract made between 2/1/2005 and 12/31/2008. Excluded from the class are any judicial officer who is assigned to hear any aspect of th e Four In One Company action or any relatedaction, governmental entities, defendants, co-conspirators, purchasers who have an Individual Settlement Agreement (as defined in the Settlement Agreement) with Defendant(s), the present and former parents, predecessors, subsidiaries and affiliates of any of the foregoing, and the Plaintiffs in Case No. 09-cv-00208 pending in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. No later than 60 days after date of this Order, the clai ms administrator shall disburse the settlement amount due to each class member. Class counsel is entitled to fees in the amount of $1.6 million. Class counsel is entitled to costs in the amount of $267,926.23. No later than fourteen days after the date of this order the claims administrator shall disburse attorneys' fees and costs. (Marciel, M)
|
January 2, 2014 |
Filing
222
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/2/2014 GRANTING 206 Motion to Certify Class; APPOINTING Hausfeld, LLP and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP as class counsel; GRANTING preliminary certification of the listed class and collective action; GRANTING preliminary approval of the settlement, GRANTING approval of the proposed notice; ADOPTING the proposed hearing schedule; SETTING a Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement, Plan of Allocation, Award of Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, and such other matters that the court deems appropriate for 6/6/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Michel, G)
|
September 20, 2013 |
Filing
210
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/19/2013 ORDERING the case STAYED as to defendants Ingomar Packing Company, Los Gatos Tomato Products, Gregory Pruett and Stuart Woolf. (Donati, J)
|
June 21, 2013 |
Filing
198
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/20/13. In light of the pending restitution hearing in United States v. Salyer, Cr. No. S-10-61 LKK, the court APPROVES the deferral of discovery at this time. After final approval of disposition as to the settling defendants, the court will schedule a further status conference to consider the status of defendant Salyer. (Meuleman, A)
|
June 27, 2011 |
Filing
186
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/24/2011 GRANTING 173 Motion for Extended Stay of Discovery. (Michel, G)
|
January 11, 2011 |
Filing
168
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/10/2011 ORDERING that both actions 2:08cv3017 MCE EFB, and 2:09cv1945 MCE EFB are related within the meaning of Local Rule 123(a), E.D. Cal. (1997). Both actions require the same factua l determination of liability upon similar, if not identical, underlying facts. Because the cases are already assigned to the same district judge, this Order is issued for informational purposes only and shall have no effect on the status of the cases. (Reader, L)
|
November 12, 2010 |
Filing
167
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/10/2010 ORDERING that The government's 159 motion for a limited discovery stay is GRANTED. As provided herein, certain discovery shall be stayed in these consolidated cases for six months from the date this order is filed. (Duong, D)
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing
157
STIPULATION and ORDER 154 extending time signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/22/2010. Parties shall have until 7/16/2010 to file their Joint Status Report. (Marciel, M)
|
June 16, 2010 |
Filing
155
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/16/10: The parties shall have until July 16, 2010 to file the Joint Status Report. (Kaminski, H)
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing
153
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 05/28/10 ORDERING that the parties have until 06/15/10 to file the Joint Status Report. (Benson, A.)
|
May 4, 2010 |
Filing
151
ORDER GRANTING ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/4/2010. Counsel shall submit joint status report by 5/28/2010. (Engbretson, K.)
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing
145
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/7/2010. (Matson, R)
|
January 12, 2010 |
Filing
137
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/11/2010 ORDERING that the parties shall have until 2/8/2010 to file the joint status report. (Engbretson, K.)
|
January 7, 2010 |
Filing
135
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/6/2010 ORDERING Defendant Stuart Woolf shall, as permitted by Federal Rule 12, shall answer, move or otherwise plead in response to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint in the above captioned action no later than January 11, 2010.(Matson, R)
|
December 9, 2009 |
Filing
123
STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLF'S CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/08/09 ORDERING that Ingomar, Los Gatos, and the Individual dfts shall answer, move or otherwise plead in response to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint by 01/04/10. (Benson, A.)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing
112
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 09/04/09 GRANTING 108 Request. Interim Class Counsel are directed to file a consolidated amended complaint no later than 11/9/09. Counsel for all parties in the case are directed to submit a Joint Status Report not later than 60 days following the filing of the consolidated amended complaint. (Streeter, J)
|
July 15, 2009 |
Filing
107
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/14/09 ORDERING that the plaintiffs may file a consolidated amended complaint in this matter until 9/8/09; counsel are directed to submit a joint status report not later than 60 days after a consolidated amended complaint is filed or if no consolidated amended complaint is filed, within the 180 day period folowing the date of the Court's original 3/11/09 order. (Gaydosh, J)
|
January 28, 2009 |
Filing
21
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 01/27/09 GRANTING 18 Stipulation Regarding Response to Complaint Pending Consolidation of Related Cases. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint shall be extended un til the earlier of the following 2 dates: 1) 30 days after the filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint in the Tomato Antitrust Cases; or 2) 30 days after Plaintiff provides written notice to Defendant that it does not intend to file a Consolidated Amended Complaint. (Streeter, J)
|
January 27, 2009 |
Filing
19
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/26/09 ORDERING that case 2:08-cv-3017, 2:08-cv-3074, 2:09-cv-0027 MCE EFB is related with member case 2:09-cv-0148 FCD KJM. (Duong, D) Modified on 1/27/2009 (Duong, D).
|
January 15, 2009 |
Filing
8
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 01/14/09 ORDERING that case number 2:08-cv-3074-MCE-KJM and case number 2:09-cv-0027-FCD-GGH are reassigned to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedi ngs; any dates currently set in these reassigned cases only are hereby VACATED; the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 02:08-cv-03074-MCE-EFB and 02:09-cv-00027-MCE-EFB; the Clerk of the Court shall make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Manzer, C)
|