Mack v. Unknown

Plaintiff: Anthony E. Mack
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2008cv03161
Filed: December 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/07/11 DENYING 27 Motion to Stay. (Williams, D)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/23/11 ORDERING the findings and recommendations 22 are ADOPTED IN FULL and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. (Carlos, K)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/6/2010 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice re 10 Amended Complaint filed by Anthony E. Mack. Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days. (Matson, R)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/20/2009 ORDERING that pltf has 30 days to submit either a cmplt or an affidavit stating the nature of the action and his belief that he is entitled to redress. Failure to comply w/ this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony E. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?