California Shock Trauma v. State Compensation Insurance, et al
Plaintiff: California Shock Trauma Air Rescue
Defendant: Truck Insurance Exchange, City of Watsonville, FirstComp Underwriters Group, American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Alaska National Insurance Company, Contra Costa County Schools Insurance Group, County of Marin, State Compensation Insurance Fund, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Ace Hardware Corporation, Special District Risck Management Authority, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Florists' Mutual Insurance Company, Municipal Pooling Authority, Ace American Insurance, Intercare Insurance Solutions, Inc., Zenith Insurance Company, Compwest Insurance Company, Virginia Surety Insurance Company, Northern California Special Districts Insurance Authority, Fire Insurance Exchange, Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Lincoln General Insurance Company, Fire Association Self-Insurance System, Seabright Insurance Company, Barrett Business Services, Inc., XL Specialty Insurance Company, Ace Property and Insurance Company, Washington State Department of Labor and Industries, Church Mutual Insurance Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Aims Insurance Services, Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund, City of Pleasanton, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Applied Underwriters, Inc., City of Salinas, Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., East Bay Regional Park District, Labor Ready Southwest Inc., CNA Insurances Services, Inc., American Home Assurance Company, Insurance Company of the West, County of El Dorado, State Farm General Insurance Company, The Davey Tree Expert, ConAgra Foods, Inc., Vanliner Insurance Company, Cypress Insurance Company, Broadspire Services, Inc., Protected Insurance Programs for Schools, Farmers Insurance Company, Kelly Services Inc., Manpower, Inc., ESIS, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Danaher Corporation, Cemex Inc., Irwin Industries, Inc., County of Santa Barbara, Trindel Insurance Fund, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Midwest General Insurance Agency, LLC, National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund, Pacific Gas & Electric Company, Lake Valley Fire Protection District, 99 Cent Only Stores, Travelers Indemnity Company, California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority, City of Monterey, Employers Compensation Insurance Company, County of Stanislaus, County of Solano, Preferred Employers Insurance Company, ABC Supply Company Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company, Lowe's HIW, Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Valley Harvesting and Packing, Inc., Waste Connections, Inc., Agrium US Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc., Marsh USA Inc., Terra Group, Republic Indemnity Company of California and Old Republic Insurance Company
Amicus Curiae: Med Trans Corporation, Air Methods Corporation, California Association of Air Medical Services, Air Evac EMS, Inc., PHI, Inc. and Mediplane, Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2009cv00090
Filed: January 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Constitutional - State Statute Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: John F Moulds
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2011 Filing 278 MANDATE of USCA ORDERING the judgment entered 3/31/11 takes effect this date. (Matson, R)
March 31, 2011 Filing 277 OPINION of USCA as to #273 Notice of Appeal filed by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue: District Court decision is AFFIRMED. (Zignago, K.)
December 6, 2010 Filing 276 STATEMENT That there are no Transcrips to order by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 12/7/2010 (Reader, L).
August 19, 2009 Filing 275 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit #273 Notice of Appeal filed by plaintiff California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Filed dates for Notice of Appeal *8/18/2009*, Complaint *1/9/2009* and Appealed Order / Judgment *7/24/2009*. Court Reporter: *N/A*. *Fee Status: Paid on 8/19/2009 in the amount of $455.00* ** (Attachments: #1 Appeal Notice, #2 Certificate of Record) (Marciel, M)
August 19, 2009 RECEIPT number #CAE200019323 $455.00 fbo California Shock Trauma by Patricia Hughes-Kreis on 8/19/2009. (Streeter, J)
August 18, 2009 Filing 273 NOTICE of APPEAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue as to #271 Order granting Motion to Dismiss.(Attachments: #1 Statement Civil Appeals Docketing Statement) (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 8/19/2009 (Marciel, M).
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 272 JUDGMENT dated *07/24/09* pursuant to order signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 07/23/09. (Streeter, J)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 07/23/09 GRANTING #107 Motion to Dismiss, #112 Motion to Dismiss, and #182 Motion to Dismiss; and GRANTING #245 Motion For Leave; and DENYING as Moot #111 Motion to Consolidate Cases and #184 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk is directed to close the file. CASE CLOSED. (Streeter, J)
July 23, 2009 Filing 270 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Labor Ready Southwest Inc.. (Cifarelli, Kevin)
July 15, 2009 Filing 269 BRIEF Letter Brief re 7-16-09 Hearing by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
July 14, 2009 Filing 268 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 78-230(h), Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #107 , #112 , #182 ; Defendants' Motion to Consolidate Cases #111 and Amicus Curiae Motion for Leave to File Brief #245 scheduled for hearing on 7/16/2009, are SUBMITTED without oral argument. The hearing date of 7/16/2009 is VACATED. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Schultz, C).
July 13, 2009 Filing 267 REPLY/RESPONSE to Defendants' Objections to Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by California Association of Air Medical Services, Air Evac EMS, Inc., Air Methods Corporation, Med Trans Corporation, PHI, Inc., Mediplane, Incorporated. (Stroud, Andrew)
July 13, 2009 Filing 266 MEMORANDUM by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue in SUPPORT of #245 MOTION for leave to file brief. (Doi, Kathryn)
July 13, 2009 Filing 265 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Fire Insurance Exchange and Truck Insurance Exchange by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
July 10, 2009 Filing 264 NOTICE JOINDER AND JOINDER IN CSAC'S OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE AND OBJECTION TO BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE by Labor Ready Southwest Inc. re #250 Opposition to Motion. (Minoya, Reina)
July 10, 2009 Filing 263 OPPOSITION by State Compensation Insurance Fund to #245 MOTION for leave to file brief. (Freitas, David)
July 10, 2009 Filing 262 JOINDER by Ace Property and Insurance Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ABC Supply Company Inc., Irwin Industries, Inc., Waste Connections, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company in re #245 MOTION for leave to file brief filed by Air Evac EMS, Inc., California Association of Air Medical Services, Air Methods Corporation, Mediplane, Incorporated, Med Trans Corporation, PHI, Inc.. in Objection to Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae and objection to Brief of Amicus Curiae (Buresh, Jill)
July 10, 2009 Filing 261 JOINDER by Seabright Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Applied Underwriters, Inc., National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, Church Mutual Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Cypress Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company in. Defendant California State Association Of Counties Excess Insurance Authority's OBJECTION To Motion For Leave To File Brief Of amicus Curiae And OBJECTION to Brief Of Amicus Curiae (Kurtz, Ronald)
July 9, 2009 Filing 260 JOINDER by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund in Support of #107 . Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint .(Kelly, Megan) Modified on 7/10/2009 (Streeter, J).
July 9, 2009 Filing 259 JOINDER by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund in Support of #112 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint.(Kelly, Megan) Modified on 7/10/2009 (Streeter, J).
July 9, 2009 Filing 258 JOINDER by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund in Objection to #245 Motion for Leave to File Brief. (Kelly, Megan) Modified on 7/10/2009 (Streeter, J).
July 9, 2009 Filing 257 REPLY by The Davey Tree Expert, Ace Property and Insurance Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ABC Supply Company Inc., Irwin Industries, Inc., Waste Connections, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company to RESPONSE to #107 Motion to Dismiss. (Buresh, Jill)
July 9, 2009 Filing 256 JOINDER by Florists' Mutual Insurance Company in Opposition to #245 Motion For Leave To File Brief. (Weinstein-Hamilton, Rebecca) Modified on 7/10/2009 (Streeter, J).
July 9, 2009 Filing 255 JOINDER by Arch Insurance Company in Opposition to #245 Motion For Leave To File Brief . Attorney Goodman, Laura L. added. (Goodman, Laura) Modified on 7/10/2009 (Streeter, J).
July 9, 2009 Filing 254 JOINDER by Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, United Natural Foods, Inc., Fire Insurance Exchange, State Compensation Insurance Fund, Zurich American Insurance Company in Objection to #245 MOTION for leave to file brief. (Weishart, Sandra) Modified on 7/10/2009 (Streeter, J).
July 9, 2009 Filing 253 NOTICE of Joinder By Employers' Insurance Company of Wausau and Safeco Insurance Complaint in #250 Opposition to Motion For Leave To file Brief. (Keshavarzi, Moe) Modified on 7/10/2009 (Streeter, J).
July 9, 2009 Filing 252 JOINDER by Labor Ready Southwest Inc. in Reply Memorandum In Support of #107 Motion to Dismiss , #182 Motion to Dismiss, and #112 Motion to Dismiss. Attorney Minoya, Reina G. added. (Minoya, Reina) Modified on 7/10/2009 (Streeter, J).
July 9, 2009 Filing 251 REPLY by Seabright Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Applied Underwriters, Inc., National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, Church Mutual Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Cypress Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company to RESPONSE to #107 Motion to Dismiss. (Kurtz, Ronald)
July 9, 2009 Filing 250 OPPOSITION by California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority to #245 MOTION for leave to file brief. (Pott, Michael)
July 9, 2009 Filing 249 REPLY by California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority to RESPONSE to #182 Motion to Dismiss. (Pott, Michael)
July 9, 2009 Filing 248 REPLY Brief by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Safeco Insurance Company of America in Support of #112 Motion to Dismiss. (Keshavarzi, Moe) Modified on 7/10/2009 (Streeter, J).
July 8, 2009 Filing 247 REPLY by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund to RESPONSE to #111 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES 2:09-CV-00090 and 2:09-CV-00759. (Kelly, Megan)
July 6, 2009 Filing 246 BRIEF in Opposition to #107 , #112 and #182 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by California Association of Air Medical Services, Air Evac EMS, Inc., Air Methods Corporation, Med Trans Corporation, PHI, Inc., Mediplane, Incorporated. Attorney Stroud, Andrew W added. (Stroud, Andrew) Modified on 7/7/2009 (Carlos, K). Modified on 7/7/2009 (Streeter, J).
July 6, 2009 Filing 245 MOTION for leave to file brief by California Association of Air Medical Services, Air Evac EMS, Inc., Air Methods Corporation, Med Trans Corporation, PHI, Inc., Mediplane, Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2009 at 02:00 PM before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment: Brief of Amicus Curiae. (Stroud, Andrew) Modified on 7/7/2009 (Carlos, K). Modified on 7/7/2009 (Carlos, K). Modified on 7/7/2009 (Streeter, J).
July 2, 2009 Filing 244 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL as to Kelly Services, Inc. and Danaher Corporation pursuant to #229 #230 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Matson, R)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/30/09 ORDERING that the Request for dismissal #238 is GRANTED. CALSTAR's First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety against City of Salinas only, pursuant to stipulation of the parties in accordance to FRCP 41(a)(2). Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees and costs.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 29, 2009 Filing 242 RESPONSE to Motion to Consolidate by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 6/30/2009 (Carlos, K).
June 26, 2009 Filing 241 OPPOSITION to Motion to Dismiss by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Kathryn Doi (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 6/29/2009 (Kaminski, H).
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/25/09 ORDERING that per #232 Stipulation, Dft Lincoln General Insurance Co is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). Each party shall bear their own attys' fees and costs.(Kastilahn, A)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/25/09 ORDERING that Manpower Inc.'s request to appear telephonically at the hearing on dfts' motion to dismiss currently set for 7/16/09 is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
June 25, 2009 Filing 238 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF CITY OF SALINAS by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
June 24, 2009 Filing 237 OPPOSITION by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue to Motion to Dismiss of dfts Employers' Insurance Company of Wausau. (Doi, Kathryn)
June 24, 2009 Filing 236 OPPOSITION by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue to #107 Motion to Dissmiss of dft Redwood Fire and Casualty Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice ; Declaration of Kathryn Doi)(Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 6/25/2009 (Duong, D).
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/23/2009 DENYING #196 Request to appear telephonically filed by Agrium US Inc. (Matson, R)
June 24, 2009 Filing 234 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION as to the 6/24/2009 Text Only Minute Order 233 : Requests for telephonic appearances for the July 16, 2009 motion hearings will not be considered by the Court. (Deutsch, S) Modified on 6/24/2009 (Deutsch, S).
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): Requests for telephonic appearances for the July 17, 2009 motion hearings will not be considered by the Court. Accordingly, the 6/8/2009 and 6/22/2009 Requests #196 #227 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/24/2009. (Deutsch, S)
June 23, 2009 Filing 232 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Lincoln General Insurance Company by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
June 23, 2009 Filing 231 PROPOSED ORDER re #227 Request by Manpower, Inc.. (Phillips, Michael)
June 23, 2009 Filing 230 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
June 23, 2009 Filing 229 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
June 22, 2009 Filing 228 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Defendant Agrium US Inc.. (Rawson, Laura) Modified on 6/23/2009 (Kaminski, H).
June 22, 2009 Filing 227 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance at the Hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Manpower, Inc. re #226 JOINDER filed by Manpower, Inc.. (Phillips, Michael) Modified on 6/23/2009 (Kaminski, H).
June 22, 2009 Filing 226 JOINDER re #112 Motion to Dismiss. (Phillips, Michael) Modified on 6/23/2009 (Kaminski, H).
June 19, 2009 Filing 225 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by Contra Costa County Schools Insurance Group. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Pulley, Warren)
June 19, 2009 Filing 224 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Cemex Inc.. Attorney Eubank, Bret Wayne added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eubank, Bret)
June 19, 2009 Filing 223 JOINDER by Broadspire Services, Inc. in Dft Broadspire Services, Inc's Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Motion to Dismiss pltf's first amended complaint. (Raphael, Roger) Modified on 6/23/2009 (Carlos, K).
June 18, 2009 Filing 222 JOINDER by defendant United Natural Foods, Inc. #107 #112 #182 Motions to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Weishart, Sandra) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 18, 2009 Filing 221 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendant United Natural Foods, Inc.. Attorney Weishart, Sandra I added. (Weishart, Sandra) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 18, 2009 Filing 220 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by defendants. (Buresh, Jill) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 18, 2009 Filing 219 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by defendants. (Buresh, Jill) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 18, 2009 Filing 218 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by defendants. (Buresh, Jill) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 18, 2009 Filing 217 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (text only) pursuant to #203 and #205 notices of voluntary dismissal and FRCP 41 (a)(1), defendants Valley Harvesting & Packing, Inc. and The Travelers Indemnity Company are DISMISSED with prejudice.(Gaydosh, J)
June 18, 2009 Filing 216 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
June 17, 2009 Filing 215 JOINDER by Irwin Industries, Inc. in defendants' #112 Motion to Dismiss. (Buresh, Jill) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 17, 2009 Filing 214 JOINDER by Irwin Industries, Inc. in defendants' #107 Motion to Dismiss. Attorney Buresh, Jill M. added. (Buresh, Jill) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 17, 2009 Filing 213 JOINDER by The Davey Tree Expert in defendants' #112 Motion to Dismiss. (Buresh, Jill) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 17, 2009 Filing 212 JOINDER by The Davey Tree Expert in defendants' #107 Motion to Dismiss. Attorney Buresh, Jill M. added. (Buresh, Jill) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 17, 2009 Filing 211 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Attorney Moe Keshavarzi added as counsel for defendants Employers Insurance Company of Wausau and Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Keshavarzi, Moe) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 16, 2009 Filing 210 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Labor Ready Southwest Inc. for #208 Joinder and #209 Disclosure Statement. (Vance, Natalie) Modified on 6/17/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 16, 2009 Filing 209 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to [F.R.C.P. 7.1] by defendant Labor Ready Southwest Inc.. (Vance, Natalie) Modified on 6/17/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 16, 2009 Filing 208 JOINDER by defendant Labor Ready Southwest Inc. in #107 #112 #182 Motions to Dismiss. Attorney Vance, Natalie P. added. (Vance, Natalie) Modified on 6/17/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 16, 2009 Filing 207 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Attorney Moe Keshavarzi added as counsel for defendants Employers Insurance Company of Wausau and Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Keshavarzi, Moe) Modified on 6/17/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 12, 2009 Filing 206 REQUEST for removal of attorney Jimmy Ly from Proof of Service list by Broadspire Services, Inc.. (Raphael, Roger) Modified on 6/15/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 11, 2009 Filing 205 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of defendant The Travelers Indemnity Company by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Gaydosh, J).
June 11, 2009 Filing 204 [DISREGARD- attorney to refile] NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of defendant Lincoln General Insurance Company by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Gaydosh, J). Modified on 6/18/2009 (Gaydosh, J).
June 11, 2009 Filing 203 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of defendant Valley Harvesting & Packing, Inc. by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Gaydosh, J).
June 11, 2009 Filing 202 [DISREGARD- attorney to refile] NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of defendant City of Salinas by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Gaydosh, J).
June 10, 2009 Filing 201 JOINDER by Protected Insurance Programs for Schools in. Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Salazar, Emmanuel)
June 10, 2009 Filing 200 JOINDER by Ace Property and Insurance Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ABC Supply Company Inc., Waste Connections, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company in re #107 Motion to Dismiss filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc., Church Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Seabright Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Cypress Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, National Liability & Fire Insurance Company. (Buresh, Jill)
June 10, 2009 Filing 199 JOINDER by Ace Property and Insurance Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ABC Supply Company Inc., Waste Connections, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company in re #112 Motion to Dismiss filed by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Safeco Insurance Company of America. Attorney Buresh, Jill M. added. (Buresh, Jill)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/5/09: Hearing RESET for 7/16/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. as to #112 Motion to Dismiss, #107 Motion to Dismiss, #111 Motion to CONSOLIDATE CASES, #182 Motion to dismiss AND Motion Hearing RESET for 8/27/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. as to #184 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Kaminski, H)
June 8, 2009 Filing 197 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Agrium US Inc.. (Rawson, Laura)
June 8, 2009 Filing 196 REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance at the Hearing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Agrium US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rawson, Laura)
June 8, 2009 Filing 195 JOINDER by Agrium US Inc. in. Motion by Other Defendants to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Rawson, Laura)
June 5, 2009 Filing 194 [DISREGARD - ATTY TO REFILE] JOINDER by Agrium US Inc. in motion by other defendants to dismiss first amended complaint. (Attachments: #1 Request to appear telephonically at hearing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Rawson, Laura) Modified on 6/8/2009 (Engbretson, K.).
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/3/09 regarding CONFIDENTIAL documents. (Carlos, K)
June 5, 2009 Filing 192 JOINDER by Insurance Company of the West in re #182 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Trindel Insurance Fund, East Bay Regional Park District, City of Monterey, City of Pleasanton, Northern California Special Districts Insurance Authority, Fire Association Self-Insurance System, Municipal Pooling Authority, City of Watsonville, Aims Insurance Services, County of Stanislaus, Special District Risck Management Authority, County of Marin, County of Santa Barbara, County of Solano, Lake Valley Fire Protection District, County of El Dorado, California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority. (McCarthy, Daniel)
June 4, 2009 Filing 191 JOINDER by Ace Property and Insurance Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Waste Connections, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company in re #107 Motion to Dismiss. . (Buresh, Jill) Modified on 6/9/2009 (Kastilahn, A).
June 4, 2009 Filing 190 JOINDER by Ace Property and Insurance Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Waste Connections, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company in re #112 Motion to Dismiss. Attorney Buresh, Jill M. added. (Buresh, Jill) Modified on 6/9/2009 (Kastilahn, A).
June 4, 2009 Filing 189 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Regarding Hearing Dates For Motions To Dismiss And Motion To Consolidate and to Withdraw Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearing Dates by Seabright Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Applied Underwriters, Inc., National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, Church Mutual Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Cypress Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Kurtz, Ronald)
June 4, 2009 Filing 188 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL as to Terra Group re #186 Notice of Dismissal. (Matson, R)
June 3, 2009 Filing 187 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Agrium US Inc.. Attorney Rawson, Laura Jean added. (Rawson, Laura)
June 3, 2009 Filing 186 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
June 2, 2009 Filing 185 EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONSOLIDATE HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULES by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue for Consolidate Hearing Date and Briefing Schedules. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kathryn Doi In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearing Date and Briefing Schedules, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff CALSTAR'S Ex Parte Application To Consolidate Hearing Dates and Briefing Schedules)(Doi, Kathryn)
June 2, 2009 Filing 184 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication, #2 Declaration Declaration of Joseph F. Cook In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication, #3 Statement Statement of Undisputed Facts In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication, #4 Declaration Request for Judicial Notice and Declaration of Kathryn Doi In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication, #5 Appendix Appendix of Authorities Pursuant to Local Rule 5-133(i), #6 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff CALSTAR'S Motion for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff's First Cause of Action For Declaratory Relief)(Doi, Kathryn)
June 2, 2009 Filing 183 JOINDER by Florists' Mutual Insurance Company in re #182 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Trindel Insurance Fund, East Bay Regional Park District, City of Monterey, City of Pleasanton, Northern California Special Districts Insurance Authority, Fire Association Self-Insurance System, Municipal Pooling Authority, City of Watsonville, Aims Insurance Services, County of Stanislaus, Special District Risck Management Authority, County of Marin, County of Santa Barbara, County of Solano, Lake Valley Fire Protection District, County of El Dorado, California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority. (Weinstein-Hamilton, Rebecca)
June 2, 2009 Filing 182 MOTION to DISMISS by Aims Insurance Services, City of Watsonville, Fire Association Self-Insurance System, California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority, Special District Risck Management Authority, East Bay Regional Park District, Trindel Insurance Fund, County of Marin, Northern California Special Districts Insurance Authority, City of Monterey, County of Solano, Lake Valley Fire Protection District, County of Santa Barbara, County of El Dorado, City of Pleasanton, County of Stanislaus, Municipal Pooling Authority. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Attorney Pott, Michael William added. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Dismiss) (Pott, Michael) Modified on 6/17/2009 (Marciel, M).
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/2/09 ORDERING that attorneys Robert J Romero, Kevin Lee Cifarelli and Jill M. Buresh are added for Waste Connections, Inc. (Engbretson, K.)
June 2, 2009 Filing 180 JOINDER by 99 Cent Only Stores in re #107 Motion to Dismiss filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc., Church Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Seabright Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Cypress Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, #112 Motion to Dismiss filed by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Heinicke, Malcolm)
June 1, 2009 Filing 179 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order re Stipulated Protective Order)(Doi, Kathryn)
June 1, 2009 Filing 178 JOINT STATUS REPORT by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
June 1, 2009 Filing 177 JOINDER by Waste Connections, Inc. in re #107 Motion to Dismiss filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc., Church Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Seabright Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Cypress Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, National Liability & Fire Insurance Company. (Kelly, Megan)
June 1, 2009 Filing 176 JOINDER by Waste Connections, Inc. in re #112 Motion to Dismiss filed by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Safeco Insurance Company of America. Attorney Kelly, Megan Catherine added. (Kelly, Megan)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): The Court is in receipt of Defendant's Notice of Substitution of Attorneys and Proposed Order #171 . Pursuant to Local Rule 5-137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in WordPerfect or Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rule 1-101, the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Submit your proposed order today, in word processing format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/28/2009. (Deutsch, S)
May 28, 2009 Filing 174 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of dft Washington State Dept. of Labor & Industries only by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 5/29/2009 (Benson, A.).
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/27/09 ORDERING that Defendant 99 Only Stores' Ex Parte Application for an initial extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant has to and including June 3, 2009 in which to file a response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Becknal, R)
May 27, 2009 Filing 172 STATEMENT of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Defendant Old Republic Insurance Company. (Garson, Edward)
May 27, 2009 Filing 171 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Waste Connections, Inc.. (McAleer, Dennis)
May 27, 2009 Filing 170 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by American Casualty Company of Reading, PA. (Woolpert, Wendy)
May 27, 2009 Filing 169 JOINDER by American Casualty Company of Reading, PA in. (Woolpert, Wendy)
May 27, 2009 Filing 168 JOINDER by American Casualty Company of Reading, PA in #112 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint . (Woolpert, Wendy) Modified on 5/27/2009 (Benson, A.).
May 27, 2009 Filing 167 STATEMENT of Disclosure by Defendant American Casualty Company of Reading, PA. Attorney Woolpert, Wendy added. (Woolpert, Wendy)
May 27, 2009 Filing 166 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Valley Harvesting and Packing, Inc. Waiver sent on 5/26/2009, answer due 7/27/2009. (Doi, Kathryn)
May 27, 2009 Filing 165 CLERK'S NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL : dft American Home Assurance Company only is DISMISSED per #160 Notice and Rule 41(a)(1). (Benson, A.)
May 26, 2009 Filing 164 NOTICE and Certification of Interested Parties by Lowe's HIW, Inc. (Forman, Stephanie)
May 26, 2009 Filing 163 JOINDER by Lowe's HIW, Inc. in #112 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Forman, Stephanie) Modified on 5/27/2009 (Benson, A.).
May 26, 2009 Filing 162 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Lowe's HIW, Inc.. Attorney Forman, Stephanie added.(Forman, Stephanie)
May 26, 2009 Filing 161 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Agrium, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
May 26, 2009 Filing 160 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
May 26, 2009 Filing 159 JOINDER by Ace American Insurance Company in #112 Motion to Dismiss filed by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Buresh, Jill)
May 26, 2009 Filing 158 JOINDER by Ace American Insurance Company in #107 Motion to Dismiss filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc., Church Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Seabright Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Cypress Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, National Liability & Fire Insurance Company. (Buresh, Jill)
May 26, 2009 Filing 157 JOINDER by Ace Property and Insurance Company in re #112 Motion to Dismiss filed by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Buresh, Jill)
May 26, 2009 Filing 156 JOINDER by Ace Property and Insurance Company in #107 Motion to Dismiss filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc., Church Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Seabright Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Cypress Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, National Liability & Fire Insurance Company. Attorney Buresh, Jill M. added. (Buresh, Jill)
May 22, 2009 Filing 155 STATEMENT of Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Defendant Zenith Insurance Company. (Devine, Brian)
May 22, 2009 Filing 154 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Contra Costa County Schools Insurance Group. Attorney Pulley, Warren Anthony added.(Pulley, Warren) Modified on 5/26/2009 (Reader, L).
May 22, 2009 Filing 153 JOINDER by Aims Insurance Services, Fire Association Self-Insurance System, California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority, Special District Risck Management Authority, East Bay Regional Park District, Trindel Insurance Fund, County of Marin, Northern California Special Districts Insurance Authority, City of Monterey, County of Solano, Lake Valley Fire Protection District, County of Santa Barbara, County of El Dorado, City of Pleasanton, County of Stanislaus, Municipal Pooling Authority in. Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Notice of Joinder in Motion to Consolidate)(Cassidy, Terence)
May 21, 2009 Filing 152 JOINDER re #107 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Barrett Business Services, Inc. (Sanchez-Behar, Daniel) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Becknal, R).
May 21, 2009 Filing 151 JOINDER re #112 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Barrett Business Services, Inc. (Sanchez-Behar, Daniel) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Becknal, R).
May 21, 2009 Filing 150 (DISREGARDED SEE #151 )MOTION to DISMISS by Barrett Business Services, Inc. Motion Hrg set for 6/25/09 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Sanchez-Behar, Daniel) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Becknal, R).
May 21, 2009 Filing 149 STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 5/22/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 21, 2009 Filing 148 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Dennis Patrick McAleer for Waste Connections, Inc. (Kelly, Megan) Modified on 5/22/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 21, 2009 Filing 147 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: The Davey Tree Expert served on 5/7/2009, answer due 5/27/2009; Ace Property and Insurance Company served on 5/7/2009, answer due 5/27/2009; ConocoPhillips Company served on 5/6/2009, answer due 5/26/2009; United Natural Foods, Inc. served on 5/7/2009, answer due 5/27/2009; ABC Supply Company Inc. served on 5/7/2009, answer due 5/27/2009; Labor Ready Southwest Inc. served on 5/7/2009, answer due 5/27/2009; Kelly Services Inc. served on 5/7/2009, answer due 5/27/2009; Cemex Inc. served on 5/7/2009, answer due 5/27/2009; City of Watsonville served on 5/11/2009, answer due 6/1/2009; Lowe's HIW, Inc. served on 5/6/2009, answer due 5/26/2009; Agrium US Inc. served on 5/7/2009, answer due 5/27/2009; American Casualty Company of Reading, PA served on 5/7/2009, answer due 5/27/2009; Irwin Industries, Inc. served on 5/7/2009, answer due 5/27/2009; Waste Connections, Inc. served on 5/12/2009, answer due 6/1/2009. (Doi, Kathryn)
May 21, 2009 Filing 146 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Truck Insurance Exchange Waiver sent on 5/13/2009, answer due 7/13/2009; Fire Insurance Exchange Waiver sent on 5/13/2009, answer due 7/13/2009. (Doi, Kathryn)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/20/09 ORDERING dfts Aims Insurance Services, Fire Association Self-Insurance System, California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority, Special District Risk Management Authority, East Bay Regional Park District, Trindel Insurance Fund, County of Marin, Northern California Special Districts Insurance Authority, City of Monterey, County of Solano, Lake Valley Fire Protection District, County of Santa B arbara, County of El Dorado, City of Pleasanton, County of Stanislaus, and Municipal Pooling Authority's Ex Parte Application for Initial Extension of Time GRANTED. Dfts have to and including 6/2/09 in which to file a response to pltf's First Amended Complaint #105 . (Carlos, K)
May 20, 2009 Filing 144 JOINDER by Insurance Company of the West in #107 MOTION to DISMISS , #112 MOTION to DISMISS . (McCarthy, Daniel) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 20, 2009 Filing 143 JOINDER by Florists' Mutual Insurance Company in #112 MOTION to DISMISS . (Weinstein-Hamilton, Rebecca) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 20, 2009 Filing 142 JOINDER by Seabright Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Applied Underwriters, Inc., National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, Church Mutual Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Cypress Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company in #112 MOTION to DISMISS . (Kurtz, Ronald) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 20, 2009 Filing 141 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sandra I Weishart on behalf of Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, State Compensation Insurance Fund, Zurich American Insurance Company. Attorney Weishart, Sandra I added. (Weishart, Sandra)
May 20, 2009 Filing 140 JOINDER in MOTION #111 by State Farm General Insurance Company. (Goodman, Laura) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 20, 2009 Filing 139 JOINDER by Florists' Mutual Insurance Company in #111 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES. Attorney Weinstein-Hamilton, Rebecca Ann added. (Weinstein-Hamilton, Rebecca) Modified on 5/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 20, 2009 Filing 138 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund. (McAleer, Dennis)
May 20, 2009 Filing 137 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund. (McAleer, Dennis)
May 19, 2009 Filing 136 STATEMENT of Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Defendant Employers Compensation Insurance Company. (Knezovich, James)
May 19, 2009 Filing 135 JOINDER by Employers Compensation Insurance Company in Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Knezovich, James) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 134 JOINDER by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund. (McAleer, Dennis) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 133 JOINDER by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund. (McAleer, Dennis) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 132 JOINDER by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund. (McAleer, Dennis) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 131 JOINDER by Florists' Mutual Insurance Company in #107 MOTION to DISMISS . (Weinstein-Hamilton, Rebecca) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Golub, Larry)
May 19, 2009 Filing 129 JOINDER by Old Republic Insurance Company in #107 MOTION to DISMISS . Attorney Garson, Edward P. added. (Garson, Edward) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 128 DISREGARD - SEE ENTRY #129 [JOINDER by Old Republic Insurance Company in re #107 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Applied Underwriters, Inc., Church Mutual Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Seabright Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Cypress Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, National Liability & Fire Insurance Company.] Attorney Savage, Sara J. added. (Savage, Sara) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Duong, D).
May 19, 2009 Filing 127 NOTICE of JOINDER by State Compensation Insurance Fund in #107 MOTION to DISMISS, #112 MOTION to DISMISS. Attorney Freitas, David M. added. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Joinder, #2 Disclosure Statement)(Freitas, David) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 126 JOINDER by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund. (McAleer, Dennis) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 125 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Fire Insurance Exchange. (Golub, Larry)
May 19, 2009 Filing 124 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. (Golub, Larry)
May 19, 2009 Filing 123 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Truck Insurance Exchange. (Golub, Larry)
May 19, 2009 Filing 122 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Golub, Larry)
May 19, 2009 Filing 121 STATEMENT by Defendant Norcal Waste Systems, Inc.. (Kelly, Megan) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 120 STATEMENT by Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund. Attorney Goodman, Laura L. added. (Goodman, Laura) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 119 STATEMENT by Defendant Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc.. (Kelly, Megan) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 118 JOINDER by Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Truck Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Zurich American Insurance Company in #107 MOTION to DISMISS . Attorney Golub, Larry Mark added. (Golub, Larry) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 117 STATEMENT by Defendant American Home Assurance Company. (Frankel, Steven) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 116 JOINDER by American Home Assurance Company in #111 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES . (Frankel, Steven) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 115 JOINDER by American Home Assurance Company in #107 MOTION to DISMISS . (Frankel, Steven) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 114 STATEMENT by Defendants Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Falzetta, Frank) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 113 JOINDER by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Safeco Insurance Company of America in #107 MOTION to DISMISS (Falzetta, Frank) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 112 MOTION to DISMISS by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Safeco Insurance Company of America. Attorney Falzetta, Frank added. Motion Hearing set for 06/25/09 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SMS) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Authorities #2 Compendium Exhibits 1 - 15 #3 Compendium of Exhibits 16 - 34 #4 Proposed Order #5 Proof of Service) (Falzetta, Frank) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 111 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES 2:09-CV-00090 and 2:09-CV-00759 by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund. Attorney Kelly, Megan Catherine added. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum #2 Proposed Order #3 Declaration of D. Pat McAleer (Kelly, Megan) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 110 ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT by Alaska National Insurance Company. Attorney Kim, Laura K. added.(Kim, Laura)
May 19, 2009 Filing 109 EX PARTE APPLICATION by 99 Cent Only Stores for Initial Extension to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memo Points & Authorities; Declaration of Malcolm A. Heinicke. Attorney Heinicke, Malcolm A. added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order(Heinicke, Malcolm) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 108 STATEMENT by Defendants Seabright Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Applied Underwriters, Inc., National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, Church Mutual Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Cypress Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Kurtz, Ronald) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Filing 107 MOTION to DISMISS by Seabright Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Applied Underwriters, Inc., National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, Church Mutual Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Cypress Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 06/25/09 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurtz, Ronald) Modified on 5/20/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/18/09 ORDERING that defendant Protected Insurance Program for Schools have to and including 6/10/09 by which to file such responsive pleading. (Becknal, R)
May 18, 2009 Filing 105 EX PARTE MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Aims Insurance Services, Fire Association Self-Insurance System, California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority, Special District Risck Management Authority, East Bay Regional Park District, Trindel Insurance Fund, County of Marin, Northern California Special Districts Insurance Authority, City of Monterey, County of Solano, Lake Valley Fire Protection District, County of Santa Barbara, County of El Dorado, City of Pleasanton, County of Stanislaus, Municipal Pooling Authority. Attorney Cassidy, Terence John added. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED ORDER)(Cassidy, Terence) Modified on 5/19/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 14, 2009 Filing 104 PROPOSED ORDER Re Initial Ex Parte Application for Extension to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Protected Insurance Programs for Schools. (Salazar, Emmanuel)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): In accordance with Local Rule 5-137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, parties are required to email the proposed order in word processing format compatible with WordPerfect (or Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Failing to comply with Local Rule 5-137(b) is a ground to strike the proposed order from the docket. The proposed order previously submitted on 5/7/2009 is stricken. A proposed order in compliance with Local Rule 5-137(b) is to be filed at mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov not later than 5/19/2009. In addition, the parties are reminded that table/cell formatting in the date and signature portions of proposed orders must be avoided when submitting them to the court. Counsel are further advised that, in the future, the use of table/cell formatting in the date and signature portions of your proposed orders may cause your document(s) to be returned unsigned and/or unprocessed. Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/13/2009. (Espana-Purpur, A)
May 12, 2009 Filing 102 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
May 11, 2009 Filing 101 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Midwest General Insurance Agency, LLC Waiver sent on 1/23/2009, answer due 3/24/2009. (Doi, Kathryn)
May 7, 2009 Filing 100 INITIAL EX PARTE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Protected Insurance Programs for Extension to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Emmanuel Salazar; Request for Judicial Notice. Attorney Salazar, Emmanuel Ramon added. (Salazar, Emmanuel) Modified on 5/8/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION #92 signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/5/09. (Kaminski, H)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 [DISREGARD (docketed in wrong case)]ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION #92 signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/5/09. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 5/6/2009 (Kaminski, H).
May 5, 2009 Filing 97 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *The Davey Tree Expert, Truck Insurance Exchange, Ace Property and Insurance Company, ConocoPhillips Company, United Natural Foods, Inc., ABC Supply Company Inc., Labor Ready Southwest Inc., Kelly Services Inc., Cemex Inc., City of Watsonville, Lowe's HIW, Inc., Agrium US Inc., American Casualty Company of Reading, PA, Fire Insurance Exchange, Irwin Industries, Inc., Valley Harvesting and Packing, Inc., Waste Connections, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Kathryn Ellen Doi* *Murphy Austin Adams Schoenfeld LLP* *PO Box 1319, 304 S Street* *Sacramento, CA 95811-1319*. (Carlos, K)
May 4, 2009 Filing 96 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *The Davey Tree Expert, Truck Insurance Exchange, Ace Property and Insurance Company, ConocoPhillips Company, United Natural Foods, Inc., ABC Supply Company Inc., Cemex Inc., City of Watsonville, Lowe's HIW, Inc., Agrium US Inc., American Casualty Company of Reading, PA, Fire Insurance Exchange, Irwin Industries, Inc., Valley Harvesting and Packing, Inc., Waste Connections, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Kathryn Doi* *Murphy Austin Adams Schoenfeld LLP* *PO Box 1319, 304 S Street* *Sacramento, CA 95811-6906*. (Carlos, K)
May 4, 2009 Filing 95 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ace Property and Insurance Company, ConocoPhillips Company, ABC Supply Company Inc., Cemex Inc., City of Watsonville, Lowe's HIW, Inc., Agrium US Inc., American Casualty Company of Reading, PA, Fire Insurance Exchange, Irwin Industries, Inc., Valley Harvesting and Packing, Inc., Waste Connections, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Kathryn Doi* *Murphy Austin Adams Schoenfeld LLP* *PO Box 1319, 304 S Street* *Sacramento, CA 95811-6906*. (Carlos, K)
May 1, 2009 PARTY UPDATE: Guideone Mutual Insurance Company terminated per #91 Notice of Dismissal. (Benson, A.)
April 30, 2009 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Service of First Amended Complaint and the Court's April 29, 2009 Order (Doi, Kathryn)
April 30, 2009 Filing 92 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Between Plaintiff and Defendants Who Have Filed Responsive Pleadings to the Filing of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
April 30, 2009 Filing 91 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
April 29, 2009 Filing 94 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Agrium US Inc., American Casualty Company of Reading, PA, The Davey Tree Expert, Truck Insurance Exchange, Ace Property and Insurance Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, Irwin Industries, Inc., United National Foods Inc., ABC Supply Company Inc., Labor Ready Southwest Inc., Kelly Services Inc., Lowe's HIW, Inc., Cemex Inc., City of Watsonville, Intercare Insurance Solutions, Inc., Seabright Insurance Company, Valley Harvesting and Packing, Inc., Waste Connections, Inc., Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Compwest Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company, Old Republic Insurance Company, Applied Underwriters, Inc., National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, Aims Insurance Services, Arch Insurance Company, Broadspire Services, Inc., Church Mutual Insurance Company, Alaska National Insurance Company, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Terra Group, Insurance Company of the West, Lincoln General Insurance Company, Employers Compensation Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, Florists' Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Ace American Insurance Company, Cypress Insurance Company, Virginia Surety Insurance Company, Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc., Fire Association Self-Insurance System, Contra Costa County Schools Insurance Group, California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority, State Compensation Insurance Fund, Protected Insurance Programs for Schools, Norcal Waste Systems, Inc., Special District Risck Management Authority, Danaher Corporation, Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund, East Bay Regional Park District, Trindel Insurance Fund, County of Marin, Barrett Business Services, Inc., Northern California Special Districts Insurance Authority, City of Monterey, Pacific Gas & Electric Company, Washington State Department of Labor and Industries, County of Solano, Lake Valley Fire Protection District, County of Santa Barbara, 99 Cent Only Stores, City of Salinas, County of El Dorado, Zurich American Insurance Company, City of Pleasanton, County of Stanislaus, Municipal Pooling Authority, Zenith Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue.(Carlos, K) Modified on 5/4/2009 (Carlos, K).
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/28/09 ORDERING that Attorney Daniel Brian McCarthy is substituted in as attorney of record for Insurance Company of the West. Attorneys Peter Roan and Ronald Kurtz are terminated. (Engbretson, K.)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/28/09 GRANTING #86 Stipulation and Proposed Order for extension of time to respond to complaint.(Engbretson, K.)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/28/09 ORDERING: Pltf's Motion for leave to file first amended complaint #71 is GRANTED. Pltfs First Amended Complaint, submitted as Exhibit A to the current Motion, shall be deemed filed on the date this Order is electronically filed, and dfts are directed to respond to the First Amended Complaint not later than 20 days following that same date. (Carlos, K)
April 24, 2009 Filing 87 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Plaintiff California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 4/27/2009 (Kaminski, H).
April 24, 2009 Filing 86 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Defendants Who Have Not Filed Responsive Pleadings by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 4/27/2009 (Kaminski, H).
April 24, 2009 Filing 85 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Intercare Insurance Solutions, Inc. served on 3/27/2009, answer due 4/16/2009; Aims Insurance Services served on 4/1/2009, answer due 4/21/2009; Terra Group served on 4/3/2009, answer due 4/23/2009; Contra Costa County Schools Insurance Group served on 4/1/2009, answer due 4/21/2009; Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund served on 4/1/2009, answer due 4/21/2009; City of Monterey served on 3/31/2009, answer due 4/20/2009; City of Salinas served on 3/27/2009, answer due 4/16/2009. (Doi, Kathryn)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/22/09 GRANTING #83 Stipulation and Proposed Order for extension of time to respond to complaint as to certain defendants. (Engbretson, K.)
April 21, 2009 Filing 83 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re #80 Stipulation by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 4/22/2009 (Kaminski, H).
April 20, 2009 Filing 82 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re #80 Stipulation by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 4/21/2009 (Kaminski, H).
April 20, 2009 Filing 81 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ronald Douglas Kurtz on behalf of Seabright Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Applied Underwriters, Inc., National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, Church Mutual Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Cypress Insurance Company, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. Attorney Kurtz, Ronald Douglas added. (Kurtz, Ronald)
April 17, 2009 Filing 80 STIPULATION Between plf and the dfts who have filed responsive pleadings to the Filing of plf's Amended Complaint and to Uniform Time to Respond by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 4/20/2009 (Benson, A.).
April 16, 2009 Filing 79 STIPULATION To Extend Time, to and including 5/15/09 to Respond to Complaint for Intercare Insurance Solutions, Inc. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 4/17/2009 (Duong, D).
April 16, 2009 Filing 78 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by City of Salinas. Attorney Matcham, Susan J. added.(Matcham, Susan)
April 16, 2009 Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): Pursuant to the Notice of Dismissal of Defendant ESIS, Inc. #59 , Defendant ESIS, Inc.'s MOTION to DISMISS #45 is DENIED as MOOT. The hearing date of May 13, 2009 is VACATED. (Schultz, C)
April 16, 2009 Filing 76 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Insurance Company of the West. Attorney McCarthy, Daniel Brian added. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(McCarthy, Daniel) Modified on 4/16/2009 (Duong, D).
April 15, 2009 Filing 75 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Steven H. Frankel on behalf of American Home Assurance Company. Attorney Frankel, Steven H. added. (Frankel, Steven)
April 15, 2009 Filing 74 STIPULATION to Extend Time, to and including 4/22/09 to Respond to Complaint for City of Monterey by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 4/15/2009 (Duong, D).
April 14, 2009 Filing 73 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Dennis Patrick McAleer and Dennis Patrick McAleer for Norcal Waste Systems, Inc. (McAleer, Dennis)
April 14, 2009 Filing 72 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Attorney Dennis Patrick McAleer added as counsel for defendant Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund. (McAleer, Dennis) Modified on 4/14/2009 (Marciel, M).
April 14, 2009 Filing 71 MOTION to AMEND the #10 COMPLAINT by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 4/14/2009 (Duong, D).
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/10/09 re #60 Pro Hac Vice Application. Added Attorney Michael R. Phillips, PHV for Manpower, Inc. (Kastilahn, A)
April 13, 2009 Filing 69 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. 99 Cent Only Stores waiver sent on 1/23/2009, answer due 3/24/2009. (Doi, Kathryn)
April 10, 2009 Filing 68 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
April 10, 2009 Filing 67 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by W. Martin Newman on behalf of Washington State Department of Labor and Industries. Attorney Newman, W. Martin added. (Newman, W.)
April 10, 2009 Filing 66 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL entered as to FirstComp Underwriters Group pursuant to #64 Notice of Dismissal. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Engbretson, K.)
April 9, 2009 Filing 65 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Seabright Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Applied Underwriters, Inc., National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, Church Mutual Insurance Company, Insurance Company of the West, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Kurtz, Ronald)
April 8, 2009 Filing 64 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
April 8, 2009 Filing 63 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Dennis Patrick McAleer for Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc. (McAleer, Dennis)
April 7, 2009 Filing 61 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Barrett Business Services, Inc.. Attorney Sanchez-Behar, Daniel added. (Sanchez-Behar, Daniel)
April 7, 2009 Filing 60 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Manpower, Inc. for attorney Michael R. Phillips to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Kane, Matthew) Modified on 4/7/2009 (Marciel, M). Modified on 4/8/2009 (Engbretson, K.).
April 7, 2009 RECEIPT number # CAE200015789 $180.00 fbo Pro Hac Vice Applicant Michael P. Phillips by Rich Duke on 4/7/2009. (Marciel, M)
April 6, 2009 Filing 59 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
March 31, 2009 Filing 58 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL as to Republic Indemnity Company of California. (Matson, R)
March 30, 2009 Filing 57 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): On the Court's own motion, the Defendants' 5/14/2009 Motion to Dismiss #45 is vacated and ADVANCED to 5/13/2009 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/30/2009. (Deutsch, S)
March 27, 2009 Filing 55 AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Lincoln General Insurance Company.(Hathaway, Sterling) Modified on 3/30/2009 (Carlos, K).
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/26/09 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:09-cv-00759-FCD-GGH, California Shock Trauma Air Rescue v. AIG Insurance Services, Inc., et al. is reassigned to Judge MorrisonC. England, Jr. and John F. Moulds for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in this reassigned case only is hereby VACATED. The Clerk of the Court is to issue an Order Requiring Joint Status Report. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:09-cv-00759-MCE-JFM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Becknal, R)
March 25, 2009 Filing 53 STATEMENT of Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of Defendant CompWest Insurance Company by Defendant Compwest Insurance Company. (Padnos, Todd)
March 25, 2009 Filing 52 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Norcal Waste Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2009, answer due 3/24/2009. (Doi, Kathryn)
March 25, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
March 24, 2009 Filing 50 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Employers Compensation Insurance Company. Attorney Knezovich, James Brian added.(Knezovich, James)
March 24, 2009 Filing 49 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Zenith Insurance Company. Attorney Devine, Brian James added.(Devine, Brian)
March 24, 2009 Filing 48 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Order re #45 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6). (Buresh, Jill)
March 24, 2009 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Jim Bond in support of #45 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6). (Buresh, Jill)
March 24, 2009 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM by Ace American Insurance Company, ESIS, Inc. in SUPPORT of #45 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6). (Buresh, Jill)
March 24, 2009 Filing 45 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) by Ace American Insurance Company, ESIS, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Buresh, Jill)
March 24, 2009 Filing 44 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Ace American Insurance Company, ESIS, Inc.. Attorney Buresh, Jill M. added.(Buresh, Jill)
March 24, 2009 Filing 43 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant NORCAL WASTE SYSTEMS, INC. to Respond to Complaint by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/30/2009 (Carlos, K).
March 24, 2009 Filing 42 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Guideone Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Blakemore, William K. added.(Blakemore, William)
March 24, 2009 Filing 41 REQUEST for Remove Duane Musfelt from your POS. by Broadspire Services, Inc.. (Raphael, Roger)
March 24, 2009 Filing 40 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Washington State Department of Labor and Industries served on 3/19/2009, answer due 4/8/2009. (Doi, Kathryn)
March 24, 2009 Filing 39 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Church Mutual Insurance Company waiver sent on 1/23/2009, answer due 3/24/2009; Alaska National Insurance Company waiver sent on 1/23/2009, answer due 3/24/2009; Fire Association Self-Insurance System waiver sent on 1/23/2009, answer due 3/24/2009; Special District Risck Management Authority waiver sent on 1/23/2009, answer due 3/24/2009; Danaher Corporation waiver sent on 1/23/2009, answer due 3/24/2009. (Doi, Kathryn)
March 24, 2009 Filing 38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
March 24, 2009 Filing 37 DEFENDANT MANPOWER INC.'S ANSWER to COMPLAINT AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES by Manpower, Inc.. Attorney Kane, Matthew C. added.(Kane, Matthew)
March 23, 2009 Filing 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES, INC. AND OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY to respond to complaint by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/30/2009 (Carlos, K).
March 23, 2009 Filing 35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY to respond to complaint by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/30/2009 (Carlos, K).
March 23, 2009 Filing 34 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Compwest Insurance Company. Attorney Padnos, Todd L added.(Padnos, Todd)
March 20, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:09-cv-00759 by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Attorney Stolman, Marc Daniel added. (Stolman, Marc)
March 20, 2009 Filing 32 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/30/2009 (Carlos, K).
March 20, 2009 Filing 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/30/2009 (Carlos, K).
March 20, 2009 Filing 30 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by XL Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Raphael, Roger added.(Raphael, Roger)
March 20, 2009 Filing 29 ANSWER to COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by Florists' Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Schaffer, Todd A. added.(Schaffer, Todd) Modified on 3/30/2009 (Carlos, K).
March 19, 2009 Filing 28 STIPULATION to extend time by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/19/2009 (Kaminski, H).
March 19, 2009 Filing 27 STIPULATION to extend time by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/19/2009 (Kaminski, H).
March 19, 2009 Filing 26 STIPULATION to extend time by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/19/2009 (Kaminski, H).
March 19, 2009 Filing 25 STIPULATION to extend time by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/19/2009 (Kaminski, H).
March 19, 2009 Filing 24 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Municipal Pooling Authority waiver sent on 1/23/2009, answer due 3/24/2009. (Doi, Kathryn)
March 17, 2009 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (text only) pursuant to #22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of defendant Preferred Employers Insurance Co. (Kaminski, H)
March 17, 2009 PARTY UPDATE: Preferred Employers Insurance Company terminated per #22 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. (Kaminski, H)
March 16, 2009 Filing 22 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/17/2009 (Kaminski, H).
March 16, 2009 Filing 21 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/17/2009 (Kaminski, H).
March 13, 2009 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Roger Raphael on behalf of Broadspire Services, Inc.. Attorney Raphael, Roger added. (Raphael, Roger) Modified on 3/13/2009 (Marciel, M).
March 12, 2009 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extend time to respond to Complaint by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/13/2009 (Marciel, M).
March 12, 2009 Filing 18 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Seabright Insurance Company, Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Employers Direct Insurance Company, Compwest Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Old Republic Insurance Company, Applied Underwriters Inc., National Liability & Fire Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Broadspire Services Inc., Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Insurance Company of the West, Employers Compensation Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, Guideone Mutual Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, Ace American Insurance Company, Cypress Insurance Company, Virginia Surety Insurance Company, Sierra Pacific Industries Inc., California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority, Protected Insurance Programs for Schools, Manpower Inc., Trindel Insurance Fund, County of Marin, Barrett Business Services Inc., ESIS Inc., Pacific Gas & Electric Company, County of Solano, County of Santa Barbara, County of El Dorado, Zurich American Insurance Company, County of Stanislaus, Zenith Insurance Company, and Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company waivers sent on 2/23/2009, answers due 4/24/2009. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/13/2009 (Marciel, M).
March 12, 2009 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. State Compensation Insurance Fund, Northern California Special Districts Insurance Authority, and Lake Valley Fire Protection District served on 2/25/2009, answer due 3/17/2009. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 3/13/2009 (Marciel, M).
March 10, 2009 Filing 16 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Broadspire Services, Inc.. Attorney Musfelt, Duane Clark added.(Musfelt, Duane)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): The Court reviewed plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report #11 and grants plaintiff's request. The Court orders the parties to file a Joint Status Report which complies with the Order Requiring Joint Status Report #5 not later than June 1, 2009, with all parties participating. Signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/10/2009. (Espana-Purpur, A)
March 5, 2009 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc.. (Addison, Shelley)
March 4, 2009 Filing 13 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Lincoln General Insurance Company. Attorney Hathaway, Sterling S added.(Hathaway, Sterling) Modified on 3/5/2009 (Engbretson, K.).
March 2, 2009 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Amendment to Answer of Defendant Sierra Pacific Industries by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Doi, Kathryn)
March 2, 2009 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. (Doi, Kathryn)
February 10, 2009 Filing 10 ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc.. Attorney Addison, Shelley C. added.(Addison, Shelley)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/6/2009. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller no longer assigned to case. All dates set in this action before the undersigned are hereby VACATED.(Reader, L)
February 3, 2009 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE: ConAgra Foods, Inc. and Vanliner Insurance Company DISSMISED without prejudice pursuant #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and FRCP 41(a)(1). (Text Only) (Schultz, C)
February 2, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff)(Doi, Kathryn)
January 16, 2009 Filing 6 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants *Intercare Insurance Solutions, Inc.; Seabright Insurance Company; Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company; Employers Direct Insurance Company; Compwest Insurance Company; The Travelers Indemnity Company; Farmers Insurance Company; XL Specialty Insurance Company; Old Republic Insurance Company; Applied Underwriters Inc.; National Liability & Fire Insurance Company; Aims Insurance Services; Arch Insurance Company; Broadspire Services Inc.; Church Mutual Insurance Company; Republic Indemnity Company of California; Vanliner Insurance Company; Alaska National Insurance Company; Employers Insurance Company of Wausau; The Terra Group; Insurance Company of the West; Lincoln General Insurance Company; Marsh USA Inc.; Employers Compensation Insurance Company; American Home Assurance Company; Florists' Mutual Insurance Company; Safeco Insurance Company of America; Guideone Mutual Insurance Company; Safety National Casualty Corporation; CNA Insurances Services, Inc.; Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.; Ace American Insurance Company; Midwest General Insurance Agency, LLC; Cypress Insurance Company; Virginia Surety Insurance Company; Preferred Employers Insurance Company; Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc.; Fire Association Self-Insurance System; Contra Costa County Schools Insurance Group; California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority; State Compensation Insurance Fund; Protected Insurance Programs for Schools; Norcal Waste Systems, Inc.; Special District Risck Management Authority; Danaher Corporation; Manpower, Inc.; Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund; East Bay Regional Park District; Trindel Insurance Fund; County of Marin; Barrett Business Services, Inc.; ESIS, Inc.; Northern California Special Districts Insurance Authority; City of Monterey; Pacific Gas & Electric Company; Washington State Department of Labor and Industries; County of Solano; Lake Valley Fire Protection District; County of Santa Barbara; 99 Cent Only Stores; City of Salinas; County of El Dorado; Zurich American Insurance Company; City of Pleasanton; ConAgra Foods, Inc.; County of Stanislaus; Municipal Pooling Authority; Ace Hardware Corporation; Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund; FirstComp Underwriters Group; Zenith Insurance Company; Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Kathryn Doi* *Murphy Austin Adams Schoenfeld LLP* *304 "S" Street* *Sacramento, CA 95812-1319*. (Marciel, M)
January 12, 2009 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms, #2 VDRP Forms) (Marciel, M)
January 12, 2009 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Compwest Insurance Company, Applied Underwriters Inc., Aims Insurance Services, Arch Insurance Company, Broadspire Services Inc., Church Mutual Insurance Company, Alaska National Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, CNA Insurances Services, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company, Cypress Insurance Company, Contra Costa County Schools Insurance Group, California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority, County of Marin, Barrett Business Services, Inc., City of Monterey, County of Solano, County of Santa Barbara, 99 Cent Only Stores, City of Salinas, County of El Dorado, City of Pleasanton, ConAgra Foods, Inc., County of Stanislaus, Ace Hardware Corporation, Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Kathryn Doi* *Murphy Austin Adams Schoenfeld LLP* *304 "S" Street* *Sacramento, CA 95812-1319*. (Marciel, M)
January 12, 2009 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 1/12/2009 (Marciel, M).
January 12, 2009 RECEIPT number # CAE200013433 $350.00 fbo plaintiff CA Shock Trauma Air Rescue by Patricia Hughes-Kreis on 1/12/2009. (Marciel, M) Modified on 1/15/2009 (Manzer, C).
January 9, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for: Declaratory Relief; Breach of Implied-In-Law Contact (Quantum Meruit); Unjust Enrichment; and Money due on Open Book Account against all defendants by California Shock Trauma Air Rescue. Attorney Doi, Kathryn Ellen added. (Doi, Kathryn) Modified on 1/12/2009 (Marciel, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Shock Trauma v. State Compensation Insurance, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Larry Mark Golub
Represented By: Sandra I. Weishart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Watsonville
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstComp Underwriters Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania
Represented By: Wendy Woolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska National Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura K. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Schools Insurance Group
Represented By: Warren Anthony Pulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Marin
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Compensation Insurance Fund
Represented By: David M. Freitas
Represented By: Laura L. Goodman
Represented By: Sandra I. Weishart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redwood Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Douglas Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Hardware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special District Risck Management Authority
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety National Casualty Corporation
Represented By: Ronald Douglas Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florists' Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd A. Schaffer
Represented By: James R Donahue
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Weinstein-Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipal Pooling Authority
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance
Represented By: Jill Buresh Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercare Insurance Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenith Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian James Devine
Represented By: Adam R. Salvas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compwest Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd Laurence Padnos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Surety Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern California Special Districts Insurance Authority
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Larry Mark Golub
Represented By: Sandra I. Weishart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Pacific Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Patrick McAleer
Represented By: Shelley C. Addison
Represented By: Megan Catherine Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guideone Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: William K. Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln General Insurance Company
Represented By: Sterling S Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Association Self-Insurance System
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seabright Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Douglas Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Business Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Sanchez-Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Property and Insurance Company
Represented By: Jill Buresh Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Labor and Industries
Represented By: W. Martin Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Douglas Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Jill Buresh Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aims Insurance Services
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Roofers Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pleasanton
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Moe Keshavarzi
Represented By: Frank Falzetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau
Represented By: Moe Keshavarzi
Represented By: Frank Falzetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Underwriters, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Douglas Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Salinas
Represented By: Susan J. Matcham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Bay Regional Park District
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labor Ready Southwest Inc.
Represented By: Reina G. Minoya
Represented By: Natalie P. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Insurances Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Steven H. Frankel
Represented By: Sean McEneaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the West
Represented By: Daniel Brian McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of El Dorado
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura L. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Davey Tree Expert
Represented By: Jill Buresh Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConAgra Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanliner Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cypress Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Douglas Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadspire Services, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Raphael
Represented By: Duane Clark Musfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protected Insurance Programs for Schools
Represented By: Emmanuel Ramon Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpower, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Phillips, PHV
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESIS, Inc.
Represented By: Jill Buresh Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norcal Waste Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Patrick McAleer
Represented By: Megan Catherine Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Larry Mark Golub
Represented By: Sandra I. Weishart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danaher Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cemex Inc.
Represented By: Bret Wayne Eubank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jill Buresh Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Barbara
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trindel Insurance Fund
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Douglas Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest General Insurance Agency, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Liability & Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Douglas Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redwood Empire Municipal Insurance Fund
Represented By: Dennis Patrick McAleer
Represented By: Megan Catherine Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Valley Fire Protection District
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 99 Cent Only Stores
Represented By: Malcolm A. Heinicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Association of Counties Excess Insurance Authority
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Monterey
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Compensation Insurance Company
Represented By: James Brian Knezovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Solano
Represented By: Michael William Pott
Represented By: Terence John Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Employers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Supply Company Inc.
Represented By: Jill Buresh Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Larry Mark Golub
Represented By: Sandra I. Weishart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's HIW, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura L. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Harvesting and Packing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Connections, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Patrick McAleer
Represented By: Megan Catherine Kelly
Represented By: Jill Buresh Nail
Represented By: Kevin Lee Cifarelli
Represented By: Robert J. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agrium US Inc.
Represented By: Laura Jean Rawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Natural Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Sandra I. Weishart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Indemnity Company of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward P. Garson
Represented By: Sara J. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Med Trans Corporation
Represented By: Andrew W. Stroud
Represented By: Landon David Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Air Methods Corporation
Represented By: Andrew W. Stroud
Represented By: Landon David Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Association of Air Medical Services
Represented By: Landon David Bailey
Represented By: Andrew W. Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Air Evac EMS, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W. Stroud
Represented By: Landon David Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHI, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W. Stroud
Represented By: Landon David Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mediplane, Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew W. Stroud
Represented By: Landon David Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Shock Trauma Air Rescue
Represented By: Marc Daniel Stolman
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Doi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?