Mitchell v. Hedgeph

Petitioner: Carl D Mitchell
Respondent: A Hedgeph
Case Number: 2:2009cv00269
Filed: January 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 04/11/12 denying 32 Motion for Reconsideration because this court does not have jurisdiction to reconsider an order issued by the Ninth Circuit. (Plummer, M)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/4/11 ORDERING the findings and recommendations 24 are ADOPTED IN FULL; Petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus 1 is DENIED; the Court DECLINES TO ISSUE A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; and the Clerk is directed to enter judgmnet and close file. CASE CLOSED.(Carlos, K)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/18/10 recommending that petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus 1 be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 04/14/09 ordering respondents are granted an extension of time of 30 days up to and including 05/07/09 to complete and file respondent's answer. (Plummer, M)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/5/09 ORDERING respondent to file a response to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus w/in 60 days; traverse/reply of answer or if response is a motion, opposition or statement of non-opposition due w/in 30 days of response; and clerk to serve a copy of this order along w/ Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and a copy of the form re consent or reassignment on Michael Patrick Farrell. (cc: Michael Farrell)(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Hedgeph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl D Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A Hedgeph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?