Watkins v. Knowles et al

Petitioner: Noel Keith Watkins
Respondent: Mike Knowles, Carol Daly and Sue Hubbard
Case Number: 2:2009cv00363
Filed: February 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/8/2010 RECOMMENDING that petitioner's application for a writ of hc and request for evidentiary hearing be denied. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due w/in 21 days. (Yin, K)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/8/2010 ORDERING that petitioner's 19 request for appointment of counsel is DENIED w/out prejudice. (Yin, K)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/3/2010 ORDERING that the 14 findings and recommendations filed December 11, 2009, are ADOPTED in full. Respondent's 12 April 21, 2009 motion to dismiss is DENIED. Respondent is directed to file an answer to the petition within sixty days. (Duong, D)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/30/09 DENYING 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/10/09 recommending that respondent's 04/21/09 motion to dismiss 12 be denied; and respondent be directed to file an answer to the petition within 60 days. MOTION to DISMISS 12 referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Knowles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Noel Keith Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carol Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sue Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?