March 4, 2013 |
Filing
63
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/1/13 ORDERING that Plaintiffs January 17, 2013 and January 31, 2013 requests for an extension of time to file his opposition to defendants motion for summary judgme nt (Doc. Nos. 55 & 62 ) are DENIED as unnecessary.Also, IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Defendant Dr. Rohrers August 16, 2012 motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 42 ) be granted; and this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
|
January 29, 2013 |
Filing
60
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/29/2013 ORDERING that, upon reconsideration, the order of the magistrate judge filed 1/8/2013, is AFFIRMED. (Zignago, K.)
|
January 8, 2013 |
Filing
54
ORDER denying 51 Motion to Appoint Counsel and medical expert signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/07/13. (Plummer, M)
|
January 3, 2013 |
Filing
49
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/02/13 ordering that within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative, if plaintiff no longer wishes to proceed in this matter, he shall file a request to dismiss this action without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Plummer, M)
|
October 15, 2012 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/12/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's 39 motion to compel discovery is DENIED; plaintiff's 43 request for an extension of time to file a motion to deny or stay defendant's motion for summary judgment is DENIED; within 30 days, plaintiff shall file his opposition to defendant Rohrer's motion for summary judgment. (Yin, K)
|
January 26, 2012 |
Filing
34
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/25/2012 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 33 are ADOPTED in FULL; The second claim of plaintiff's amended complaint # 12 is DISMISSED as duplicative; The third, fourth and fifth claims of plaintif f's amended complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a cognizable claim; This action shall proceed solely on plaintiff's first claim against defendant Dr. Rohrer for providing plaintiff inadequate medical care in violation of the Eighth Amendment; and within 14 days from the service of this order, defendant Rohrer shall file an answer.(Reader, L)
|
December 14, 2011 |
Filing
33
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/13/11 ORDERING that defendant's 10/05/11 32 Request for Clarification is GRANTED; defendant's answer shall be filed within fourteen days following any o rder by the assigned District Judge with respect to these findings and recommendations; and RECOMMENDING that: the second claim of plaintiff's 12 amended complaint be dismissed as duplicative; the third, fourth and fifth claims of plaintiff 39;s amended complaint be dismissed for failure to state a cognizable claim; and this action proceed solely on plaintiff's first claim against defendant Dr. Rohrer for providing plaintiff inadequate medical care in violation of his rights under the Eighth Amendment. Objections to these F&Rs due within 21 days; referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. (Benson, A.)
|
September 7, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER ADOPTING 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, in full, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/5/2011. Defendants' 19 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is DENIED. Within 30 days from service of Order, defendant Rohrer is ordered to file his Answer. (Marciel, M)
|
July 19, 2011 |
Filing
29
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/18/11 ORDERING plaintiff's 05/12/11 motion in response to the court's order to show cause and request to discharge the order to show cause 25 is granted ; and the order to show cause filed on 03/01/11 is discharged. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant's 01/14/11 motion to dismiss the amended complaint due to plaintiff's alleged failure to exhaust his available administrative remedies prior to filing suit 19 be denied and that defendant be ordered to file an answer. Motion to Dismiss 19 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
|
March 1, 2011 |
Filing
22
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/28/2011 ORDERING that, w/in 30 days, pltf to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss and shall show cause in writing why sanctions should not be imposed for the failure to file a timely opposition; in the alternative, pltf may file a request to dismiss this action w/out prejudice pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a). (Yin, K)
|
November 9, 2009 |
Filing
8
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/6/09 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Nathan Kevin Turner to the clerk until the balance of $350 is p aid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
|