February 5, 2014 |
Filing
93
STIPULATION and ORDER dismissing case pursuant to FRCP 41 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/5/14. (Manzer, C)
|
February 4, 2014 |
Filing
90
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/4/2014 ORDERING that within fourteen days from the date of this order the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or other dispositional documents, and shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why sanctions should not be imposed for the failure to timely file dispositional documents.(Waggoner, D)
|
May 9, 2013 |
Filing
85
ORDER denying 78 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/09/13. (cc: EFB) (Plummer, M)
|
May 8, 2013 |
Filing
84
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/07/13 ordering the custodian to produce Richard H. Greene at 06/12/13 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD, EFB & KJN)(Plummer, M)
|
April 2, 2013 |
Filing
76
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/1/2013 DENYING plaintiff's 75 motion for the appointment of counsel. (cc: EFB) (Yin, K)
|
March 25, 2013 |
Filing
74
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/22/2013 GRANTING, in part, plaintiff's 72 motion to modify the 1/14/13 scheduling order; plaintiff's pretrial statement and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of trial w itnesses is due on or before 4/15/2013, defendants pretrial is statement due on or before 4/29/2013; the Pretrial Conference is set for 5/30/2013 before Magistrate Judge Molds, to be conducted on the file only; and the 8/19/2013 Trial Date before John A. Mendez at 8:30 a.m. shall remain the same. (cc: EFB) (Yin, K)
|
March 29, 2012 |
Filing
67
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/29/2012 ADOPTING 66 Findings and Recommendations in full. Plaintiff's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and Defendants' 55 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. (Donati, J)
|
March 2, 2012 |
Filing
66
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 3/1/12 ORDERING that defendants 61 motions to allow late filings and for judicial notice are granted; and RECOMMENDING that 55 Motion for Summary Judgment be denied; and 53 Motion for Summary Judgment be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
|
August 23, 2011 |
Filing
54
ORDER signed by Judge John F. Moulds on 08/23/11 ORDERING that dfts' 52 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; dfts' Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 08/29/11. (Benson, A.)
|
May 3, 2011 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/2/2011 DENYING pltf's 48 request for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
|
January 3, 2011 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/3/2011 ORDERING that pltf's 37 motion to withdraw consent is DENIED; and the clerk to assign a district judge to this matter. This case has been assigned to US District Judge John A. Mendez and US Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds; the new case number is 2:09-cv-0793 JAM JFM (PC). (Yin, K)
|
October 6, 2010 |
Filing
43
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/5/10 denying 40 Motion to Compel; Plaintiff's request for sanctions is denied. (Dillon, M)
|
August 10, 2010 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/9/2010 GRANTING pltf's 36 motion for an extension; pltf's motion to compel due on or before 8/20/2010; pursuant to pltf's 37 request, the clerk to send pltf a blank copy of the Order Re Consent. (Yin, K)
|
April 30, 2010 |
Filing
35
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/29/10 ORDERING that Pltf's 30 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions is DENIED; Pltf shall serve on Deft his request for production of documents within 15 days of the date of this order. It is further ORDERED that the Court's 2/2/10 27 Scheduling Order is MODIFIED as follows: Discovery conducted until 7/27/10; all pretrial motions filed by 10/27/10. (Owen, K)
|
February 2, 2010 |
Filing
27
ORDER AND MODIFIED DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 2/1/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 23 motion to compel is DENIED w/out prejudice; pltf's 23 motion for sanctions is DENIED w/out prejudice; and pl tf's 23 motion for an extension of time to complete discovery is GRANTED; Discovery due by 3/29/2010; All Pretrial Motions, except motions to compel discovery, due by 6/28/2010; Pretrial Conference and Trial dates to be set as appropriate.(Yin, K)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/26/09 DENYING 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; GRANTING 18 Motion for clarification. The parties are relieved of their obligation to file status reports as set forth inthe courts 5/29/09 order. (Dillon, M)
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing
13
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/18/09 ORDERING the clerk to fwd the lodged 6/26/09 service documents and a copy of the 6 Order on atty Tracy Lum at Alhambra Ave. address. (Yin, K) Modified on 8/20/2009 (Plummer, M).
|
July 1, 2009 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 6/30/09 ORDERING that 10 Motion is DENIED; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed IFP; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis.(Dillon, M)
|
April 2, 2009 |
Filing
4
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/1/09 ORDERING that 2 Request is partially granted; Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application toProceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
|