Thomas v. Betti et al

Plaintiff: Edward Thomas
Defendant: L. Betti, D. Neimann and M. Beutler
Case Number: 2:2009cv00871
Filed: March 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/9/10 ORDERING the findings and recommendations 15 filed 8/11/10 are ADOPTED IN FULL; this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. (Carlos, K)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/10/10 recommending that this case be dismissed (Docket No 8 ) without prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/22/2010 ORDERING that w/in 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion to dismiss or a statement of non-opposition.(Matson, R)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/24/09 ORDERING that the dfts file a response to the 1 cmplt w/in 30 days. (Yin, K) (Corrected Image added on 8/25/2009) (Yin, K). Modified on 8/25/2009 (Yin, K).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Betti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Betti
Represented By: Lisa Anne Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Neimann
Represented By: Lisa Anne Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Beutler
Represented By: Lisa Anne Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?