January 12, 2016 |
Filing
194
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/11/16 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Willie Bridges at 1:00 pm on 2/4/16 in Courtroom 1 before Judge Craig M. Kellison. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: OTCD)(Dillon, M)
|
December 23, 2015 |
Filing
190
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/23/15 ordering the Custodian to produce Robert Johnson on 1/25/16 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 2 Before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out to Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Plummer, M)
|
December 22, 2015 |
Filing
188
ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/22/2015 ORDERING the custodian to produce Willie Bridges C-62349, to testify in USDC at 9:00 a.m. on 1/25/2016 in courtroom 2, before Judge Tr oy L. Nunley; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and SQ Warden. The Clerk shall also serve a copy by fax on the SQ Litigation Coordinator. (cc: OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
|
September 28, 2015 |
Filing
183
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/25/15 ordering plaintiff's motions for the appointment of counsel 177 , 179 , and 181 are denied. The clerk of the court is directed to terminate plaintiff's motions in limine 170 and 175 and those motions will be addressed by the trial judge on the first day of trial. (Plummer, M)
|
October 2, 2014 |
Filing
156
AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/01/14 ordering the custodian to produce Robert Johnson on 11/03/14 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 2 before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Cust odian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Plummer, M) Modified on 10/2/2014 (Plummer, M).
|
September 29, 2014 |
Filing
154
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/27/14 ordering the custodian to produce Darryl Johnson at 11/03/14 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 2 before District Judge Troy L. Nunley Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Plummer, M)
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing
150
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/26/14 GRANTING 141 Motion to obtain the attendance of incarcerated witnesses at trial. At the appropriate time the court will issue separate orders and writs of habeas corpus ad testificandum for the witnesses to appear at trial. (Manzer, C)
|
August 5, 2014 |
Filing
147
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/4/14 ORDERING that within 30 days of the date of service of this order plaintiff shall file a pretrial statement that addresses the matters listed in Local Rule 281(b).(Dillon, M)
|
March 24, 2014 |
Filing
140
ORDER denying 138 Motion to reopen discovery and 139 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/21/14: Plaintiff is granted fourteen days from the date of service of this order to file and serve his pretrial statement and any motions necessary to obtain the attendance of witnesses at trial. Within thirty days of service of plaintiff's pretrial statement, the defendant shall file his pretrial statement. (Kaminski, H)
|
November 26, 2013 |
Filing
132
AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/25/13 ordering the writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued on 11/08/13 is vacated. The custodian is ordered to produce Willie Bridges via videoconferencing at 02/13/14 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 27 before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept-Sacramento)(Plummer, M)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing
130
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/07/13 ordering the Custodian to produce Willie Bridges via video conferencing at 1/09/14 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 27 before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: IT Dept-Sacramento) (Plummer, M)
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing
123
ORDER ADOPTING 121 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/13/13 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 91 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment Cruel and Unusual Punishment claim is dismi ssed for failure to state a claim. Defendants R S Johnson, R Marquez, Marsh, G. Marshall, R. K. Wong, Crandell and R Inicevich are dismissed from this action. This matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on the retaliation claim against defendant Davey. (Manzer, C)
|
July 17, 2013 |
Filing
121
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/16/2013 ORDERING that defendants' 93 request that confidential memoranda from plaintiff's central file, referenced as Exhibit B in support of defenda nts' motion for summary judgment, be reviewed by the court in camera and filed under seal is GRANTED ; the Clerk shall file UNDER SEAL the confidential memoranda until further ordered by the court; and plaintiff's 119 Rule 56(d) motio n is DENIED; and RECOMMENDING that defendants' 91 motion for summary judgment be granted in part and denied in part; plaintiff's Eighth Amendment Cruel and Unusual Punishment claim be dismissed for failure to state a claim; defendants Crandall, Ivicevich, Johnson, Marquez, Marsh, Marshall, and Wong be dismissed from this action; and this matter be referred back to Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd for further proceedings on plaintiff's retaliation claim against defendant Davey. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days. (See Findings and Recommendations for Details)(Yin, K)
|
June 7, 2013 |
Filing
118
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/6/2013 ORDERING that plaintiff's 112 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
|
April 30, 2013 |
Filing
110
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/29/13 granting 108 Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a courtesy copy of defendants' motion for summary judgment 91 , 92 ,and 93 . Plaintiff shall file an opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment within 21 days. Defendants shall file a reply, if any, in accordance with Local Rule 230(l). (Plummer, M)
|
April 17, 2013 |
Filing
106
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/16/13 granting 105 Motion for extension of time. Plaintiff shall place his opposition in the mail on or before 05/10/13. Any reply shall be filed and served in accordance with Local Rule 230(l). (Plummer, M)
|
March 26, 2013 |
Filing
101
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/21/13 ORDERING that plaintiffs motions for a court order allowing him to communicate with prisoners at other prisons (Doc. Nos. 89 & 94 ) are DENIED; Plaintiffs motion and request for a rulin g of summary judgment reliefs (Doc. No. 95 ) is DENIED; Plaintiffs motion for a court-ordered settlement conference (Doc. No. 98 ) is DENIED as premature; Plaintiffs requests for rulings on his pending motions (Doc. No. 99 & 100 ) are GRANTED; and plaintiff shall file an opposition to defendants motion for summary judgment within 21 days of the date of service of this order.(Dillon, M)
|
January 3, 2013 |
Filing
97
ORDER denying 96 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/02/13. (Plummer, M)
|
August 27, 2012 |
Filing
84
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/24/12 granting 83 Motion for extension of time. Defendants shall file a motion for summary judgment on or before 09/10/12. (Plummer, M)
|
May 24, 2012 |
Filing
82
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/24/12. ORDERING that plaintiff's 78 Motion to Compel is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
|
March 19, 2012 |
Filing
80
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/19/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time to file a motion to compel 76 is granted. Plaintiffs motion to compel is deemed timely; Defendants shall file a response to plaintiff s motion to compel within thirty days of the date of this order. Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any, in accordance with Local Rule 230(l); Defendants motion to modify the scheduling order 79 is granted. Defendants shall file any dispositive motion within ninety days of the court issuing an order on plaintiffs motion to compel; and plaintiffs motion for a court order allowing him to communicate with potential thirty-party inmate witnesses 77 is denied. (Dillon, M)
|
August 8, 2011 |
Filing
71
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/8/11 ORDERING that plaintiffs 66 motion for an extension of time to conduct discovery is GRANTED; Plaintiffs 67 and 68 motions to re-issue a scheduling order in light of defendant Marquezs app earance in this action are GRANTED. The courts 56 discovery and scheduling order is VACATED. The court will issue a separate discovery and scheduling order with new discovery and pretrial motion cut-off dates; and Plaintiffs 69 motion for a court order allowing him to communicate with potential thirty-party inmate witnesses is DENIED without prejudice. (Dillon, M)
|
June 8, 2011 |
Filing
65
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/7/11 DENYING 63 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
|
May 10, 2011 |
Filing
62
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/09/11 ordering that plaintiff's motions 58 and 59 are denied as moot. (Plummer, M)
|
May 25, 2010 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/25/10 ordering plaintiff's 05/19/10 motion for an extension of time 29 is granted. Plaintiff shall file and serve a third amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaint iff's 05/20/10 motion to remove an exhibit to supplement his third amended complaint 30 is denied as unnecessary. Plaintiff shall make any requests for copies of his pleadings previously filed with the court directly to the clerk of court. (Plummer, M)
|
April 27, 2010 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/10 ORDERING that plaintiffs 26 second amended complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days leave to amend; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff the courts form for filing a civil rights action.(Dillon, M)
|
February 17, 2010 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/16/10 ordering plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a second amended complaint. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff a copy of the court's 11/02/09 screening order 11 .(Plummer, M)
|
November 2, 2009 |
Filing
12
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Willie Bridges signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/30/09. CDC is to collect monthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
|