Columbus Life Insurance v. Hill, et al
Plaintiff: |
Columbus Life Insurance Company |
Defendant: |
Gavin Hill, Kristan Hill-Love, Holly Looman, Kyle Hill and Katrina Clemons |
Case Number: |
2:2009cv00947 |
Filed: |
April 6, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Insurance Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank C. Damrell |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1335 Interpleader Action |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
46
JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/20/2011 that Defendant and Claimant Kristan Hill-Love shall receive the remaining funds on deposit with the Court forthwith. The Clerk of the U.S. District Court is instructed to issue a chec k in the name of Kristan Hill-Love forthwith for the funds remaining on deposit in this action together with all interest accumulated thereon. Further, Defendant and Claimant Kristan Hill-Love's claims related to this action for costs, attorneys' fees and any action for malicious prosecution arising out of the filing of and/or participation in this action by Defendants Gavin Hill, Holly Looman, Katrina Clemons and Kyle Hill are hereby DISMISSED. (CFS)(Duong, D)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing
27
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 9/16/10 ORDERING in sum, plaintiff is entitled to the recovery of documented costs, which totals $698.05. Plaintiff is also entitled to the recovery of $1875 in attorneys' fees (($250/ hr x 15 hrs.) 2 = 1875). As such, plaintiff is awarded $2,573.05 in fees and costs to be awarded from the interpleaded fund. CONCLUSION For the foregoing reasons, plaintiff's 16 motion for order granting discharge is GRANTED, and plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees and costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Becknal, R)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
14
RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 10/21/2009 ORDERING that the action denominated CIV S-09-2713 FCD KJM shall be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd for all further proceedings; the caption shall be CIV S-09-2713 FCD DAD; the Clerk is directed to make the appropriate adjustment for this reassignment. (Suttles, J)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?