July 26, 2012 |
Filing
208
ORDER of satisfaction of judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/25/12; ORDERING that defendants' motion is GRANTED and the judgment in this case has been satisfied. (Kastilahn, A)
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing
203
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/15/12: Defendants are authorized to issue payment in the amount of Thirty One Thousand dollars ($31,000.00), payable to the Cullicini Family Trust in order to satisfy fully the judgment for monetary damages entered by the court upon the jury verdict. Upon proof of payment, defendants will be entitled to a full satisfaction of the judgment entered upon the jury verdict in this case. (Kaminski, H)
|
December 29, 2011 |
Filing
199
AMENDED JUDGMENT and ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT dated *12/29/2011* pursuant to order signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/28/2011. The judgment # 163 entered upon the jury verdict by this court on 3/10/2011 is hereby AMENDED to include an award of attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $331,225.12 payable to the Law Office of Stewart Katz, which when paid shall constitute full and final satisfaction of the judgment for expenses, fees and costs. (Reader, L)
|
August 12, 2011 |
Filing
192
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/12/11 GRANTING 168 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $273,622.50 in attorneys' fees for litigation and trial; Plaintiff is awarded $6,404.47 in expense s; Plaintiff is awarded $18,855.00 in attorneys' fees for opposing defendants' renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law; and Plaintiff is awarded $17,745.00 in attorneys' fees in connection with the plaintiff's attorneys' fees motion. (Donati, J)
|
July 25, 2011 |
Filing
190
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/22/11 ORDERING that dft's 167 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a matter of law is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
|
April 15, 2011 |
Filing
180
STIPULATION and ORDER 179 for continuance signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/15/2011. Plaintiffs' 168 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Hearing is RE-SCHEDULED for 5/20/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD). (Marciel, M)
|
February 16, 2011 |
Filing
129
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/15/11 ORDERING that dfts' 102 Motion in Limine and plf's 103 Motion in Limine are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as detailed in the order. (Benson, A.)
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing
98
ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/25/2010 ORDERING this matter is reassigned to the Honorable Dale A. Drozd. The parties shall take note that all documents filed hereafter with the Clerk shall bear case number 2:09-cv-1025 DAD. All currently scheduled dates presently set before Judge Shubb are vacated.(Matson, R)
|
September 30, 2010 |
Filing
94
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/24/2010 GRANTING 90 Stipulation and Proposed Order to reassign case to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Matson, R)
|
September 29, 2010 |
Filing
93
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/29/2010 ORDERING 92 A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 10/6/2010 at 10:00 AM, for the purpose of setting a date for trial of this case before DAD; each attorney is to provide Courtroom Deputy Pete Buzo with a land line telephone number to be used for purposes of holding the conference call. (Reader, L)
|
September 24, 2010 |
Filing
89
ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/23/10: Application to modify final pretrial order is APPROVED. (Kaminski, H)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing
82
ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/23/2010 ORDERING 81 Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/23/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. This stipulation is made with the agreement that the currently set trial date of 10/13/2010, remain unchanged. (Reader, L)
|
July 20, 2010 |
Filing
80
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/19/2010 ORDERING 68 that defendants McGinness, Maness, and Lewis's motion for summary judgment on all claims asserted against them be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. (Reader, L)
|
April 1, 2010 |
Filing
63
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/01/10 ORDERING that plf's 47 , 48 , 49 Motions to Compel are GRANTED in part. (Benson, A.)
|
February 12, 2010 |
Filing
46
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/11/2010 ORDERING 45 That the expert witness disclosure cut-off date is reset for 3/15/2010; and the rebuttal expert witness disclosure cut-off date reset to 4/1/2010; with the agreement that the currently set pretrial conference date of 8/9/2010, and the trial date of 10/13/2010, remain unchanged. (Reader, L)
|
January 29, 2010 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/28/2010. This case came before Court on 1/22/2010 for hearing on plaintiffs 21 Motion to Compel production of documents. For the reasons stated on record at Hearing, plaintiffs Motion was GRANTED. Defendant ordered to produce requested documents no later than 10 days after Hearing date. Plaintiffs Request for imposition of sanctions was DENIED. (Marciel, M)
|
January 5, 2010 |
Filing
23
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 01/04/10 ORDERING that the 17 Pretrial Scheduling Order is MODIFIED as follows: expert witness disclosure cut-off date: 02/15/10; rebuttal expert witness discovery cut-off date is 03/01/10. (Benson, A.)
|
December 28, 2009 |
Filing
19
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 18 REGARDING DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/24/09. (Kastilahn, A)
|
August 5, 2009 |
Filing
17
STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/5/09: Discovery due by 9/11/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb.(Kaminski, H)
|