Lipscomp v. Brimhall et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Lipscomp
Defendant: Troy Brimhall and Paul Sheeran
Case Number: 2:2009cv01182
Filed: April 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/30/10 recommending that 17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be granted. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/21/09 ORDERING that the parties may conduct discovery until 3/19/10; Any motions necessary to compel discovery shall be filed by that date. All requests for discovery shall be served not later than sixty days prior to that date; All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 7/19/10. Motions shall be briefed in accordance with paragraph 7 of this court's order filed 8/20/09; and Pretrial conference and trial dates will be set, as appropriate, following adjudication of any dispositive motion, or the expiration of time for filing such a motion. (Becknal, R)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve * complaint * filed on * 4/30/09,* on * Troy Brimhall, Paul Sheeran*, signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/19/09. (Plummer, M)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jesse Lipscomp signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/14/09. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee of $1.67 and thereafter the $348.33 balance and fwd to the Clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipscomp v. Brimhall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Lipscomp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Brimhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sheeran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?