The Council For Education v. California Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: |
The Council For Education |
Defendant: |
California Attorney General, California Fair Political Practices Commission, Connerly & Associates, Inc., Internal Revenue Service and U.S. Department of Education |
Case Number: |
2:2009cv01503 |
Filed: |
June 1, 2009 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Edmund F. Brennan |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank C. Damrell |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
No cause code entered |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 20, 2010 |
Filing
60
STIPULATION and ORDER 59 signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr., on 5/20/10: The proposed amended complaint 8 filed on 7/28/09 is ACCEPTED as of 7/28/09. The U.S. Dept of Education's motion to dismiss the claim against it for lack of jurisdi ction because of the anti-injunction provision in the Higher Education Act, 20 U.S.C. § 1082(a)(2), is GRANTED. The US' motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, on behalf of the IRS, for lack of a waiver of sovereign immun ity under 26U.S.C. § 7408(a) and for pltfs' lack of standing to challenge a third-party organization'stax-exempt status, is GRANTED. The US' motion on behalf of the IRS to dismiss all remaining claims against the IRS for lack of s ubject matter jurisdiction, for failure to show an applicable waiver of sovereign immunity, is GRANTED. Because the Council for Education is now represented by counsel, the motion to dismiss it as a pltf for lack of counsel is WITHDRAWN. The amended complaint 8 is DISMISSED for the reasons stated in this Order. Pltf's 27 motion to recuse an Asst US Atty and award monetary sanctions is DENIED with prejudice. Pltfs have 30 days leave to amend. If pltfs do not file an amended complaint by the 30th day from the filing date of this order, without further order of the Court the action will be dismissed with prejudice as to the fed dfts. (Kastilahn, A)
|
March 26, 2010 |
Filing
56
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/26/2010. Attorney Rickey Ivie retained as counsel for plaintiff Council for Education. Judge Newman hereby VACATES hearings set for 4/1/2010 and parties shall re-notice their respective pending Motions for dates be District Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. Status Conference set for 4/22/2010 is VACATED and subject to re-setting by Judge Damrell. (Marciel, M)
|
November 24, 2009 |
Filing
47
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/24/09: Plaintiffs' motion for a continuance, is granted 45 . HEARING as to 36 MOTION for JUDGMENT, 35 MOTION to STRIKE, 30 Motion for Sanctions, 29 Motion to Amend the Complaint, 27 AMENDED MOTION to DISMISS RESET for 2/24/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Status Conference RESET for 3/24/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. 42 Motion is denied as moot. (Kaminski, H)
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing
10
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/4/09 ORDERING that pltf's ex parte writ for review and equitable indemnity, submitted 7/13/09,is DENIED. The Clerk shall unseal and file the writ. Pltf shall not submit or file any more documents in this case, either directly or under seal, until after he has demonstrated service of process upon dfts, and dftshave filed a responsive pleading or motion.(Kastilahn, A)
|
July 10, 2009 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/10/09 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request for review pursuant to his 'Sealed First amended Ex Parte Writ for an FPPC Judicial Review" is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall unseal and routinely file plaintiff's "Ex Parte Writs" (the original and amended filings) submitted by plaintiff on 7/8/09. (Streeter, J)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?