Heavenly Valley Limited Partnership v. Lake Tahoe Development Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Heavenly Valley LP and RockResorts International LLC
Defendant: Lake Tahoe Development Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv01533
Filed: June 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 3/2/11 against Lake Tahoe Development Company, LLC, CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 8/26/2010 ADOPTING 24 Findings and Recommendations. Pltfs' 19 Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED. Injunctive relief is GRANTED as specified in Pltf's proposed judgment which is approved as to form and substance. (Zignago, K.)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/22/2010 recommending that plts' 19 motion for default be granted. Injunctive relief be granted as specified in plaintiffs' proposed judgment which is approved as to form and substance. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Duong, D)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/17/2010 ORDERING that the May 20, 2010 hearing on the 19 motion for default judgment, filed April 15, 2010, is VACATED and the motion is submitted on the record. (Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heavenly Valley Limited Partnership v. Lake Tahoe Development Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavenly Valley LP
Represented By: Jill Haley Penwarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RockResorts International LLC
Represented By: Jill Haley Penwarden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Tahoe Development Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?