Carden et al v. Chenega Security & Protection Services, LLC
Plaintiff: James T. Carden, Jr., Robert L. Fox, Leon W. Hedrick, Robert B. Klee, George M. Lembo, Loren E. Loveland, Terry D. Myers, Charles R. Samuelson, Michael B. Schaefer, Arthur J. Schubert, Thurlow E. Williams, Michelle W. Woods, Raymond E. Young and William H. Ziegler
Defendant: Chenega Security & Protection Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv01799
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION and ORDER 111 for Dismissal signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/2/2011. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Settlement Agreement. (Marciel, M)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/28/11, ORDERING that 105 Chenega's motion for clarification is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING 39 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/9/11. (Manzer, C)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/13/11: Plaintiff Lembo shall file a supplemental brief on or before April 19, 2011. Defendant shall file a supplemental brief on or before April 26, 2011. HEARING as to 54 Motio n to Withdraw as Counsel, 39 Motion for Summary Judgment continued to 5/9/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. The deadline for taking expert witness depositions is extended to June 8, 2011. Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Extend Dates is DENIED 96 . (Kaminski, H)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/7/11 ORDERING plaintiff's motion to waive deemed admissions (Doc. 75) is denied; and Defendant's motion to compel (Doc. 74) is withdrawn and terminated as a pending motion on the court's docket. (Matson, R)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re EX PARTE APPLICATION to EXTEND DATES signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/24/2011. Plaintiff's 54 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and defendant's 39 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing is CONTINUED to 4/11/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS). The deadline for taking expert witness depositions is EXTENDED to 5/11/2011. (Marciel, M)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/9/2011. The Court is in receipt of 2 Motion noticed for hearing on 2/28/2011. Attorney Michael Cogan has file a Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for plaintiff. And Mr. Cogan is reminded that unless and until he is relieved, he has an obligation to file an Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. (Marciel, M)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER 37 signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/2/11; Leon W. Hedrick, Robert B. Klee, Loren E. Loveland, Terry D. Myers, Charles R. Samuelson, Michael B. Schaefer, Arthur J. Schubert, Thurlow E. Williams, Michelle W. Woods, Raymond E. Young, William H. Ziegler, James T. Carden, Jr. and Robert L. Fox are dismissed w/prejudice. (Matson, R)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/25/2011 ORDERING that the date for completion of all discovery is EXTENDED to 3/16/2011. The deadline for filing dispositive motions shall be EXTENDED to 4/18/2011. The final pre-trial conference is CONTINUED to 8/22/2011 at 02:00 PM. The trial is CONTINUED to 10/18/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Zignago, K.)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 01/12/11 ORDERING deadlines continued; Discovery due by 2/15/2011, Dispositive Motions filed by 1/28/2011. (Williams, D)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/13/10 ORDERING the terms of the Stipulation and Protective Order approved and Adopted. (Williams, D)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 9/23/10: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/15/2010. Discovery due by 1/14/2011. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/14/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER 26 to extend cut-off date signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/31/2010. Designation of Expert Witnesses is CONTINUED to 9/30/2010. Rebuttal Experts and Reports for Expert Testimony is NOW DUE on 10/22/2010. (Marciel, M)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/1/10 ORDERING that the deadline to disclose expert witnesses is extended to 9/1/10; rebuttal deadline extended to 10/1/10; the deadline to complete all non-expert discovery is extended to 12/1/10. (Owen, K)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 pltfs' motion to modify and/or quash subpoenas pursuant to FRCP 45(c)(3)(A)(iii), signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/28/10. All subpoenas issued to former employers and the military are hereby modified to specifically exclude any confidential medical information. Dft's request for sanctions is DENIED.(Kastilahn, A)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/25/2010 GRANTING 12 Stipulation and Proposed Order; The deadline of 7/1/2010 to disclose experts and produce reports shall be vacated and continued to August 2, 2010; The deadline of August 2, 2010 to dis close experts and produce reports for expert testimony intended solely for rebuttal shall be vacated and continued to September 1, 2010; and the deadline of October 1, 2010 to complete all non-expert discovery, including depositions for preservation of testimony, shall be vacated and continued to November 1, 2010. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carden et al v. Chenega Security & Protection Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. Carden, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Fox
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon W. Hedrick
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B. Klee
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George M. Lembo
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren E. Loveland
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry D. Myers
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Samuelson
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Schaefer
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur J. Schubert
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurlow E. Williams
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle W. Woods
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond E. Young
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Ziegler
Represented By: Andrea M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chenega Security & Protection Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?