Somera, et al. v. Indymac Federal Bank, FSB, et al.
Plaintiff: Gordon Somera and Delores L Somera
Defendant: Indymac Federal Bank, FSB, Quicken Loans Inc, NDEX West LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. and Mike George
Case Number: 2:2009cv01947
Filed: July 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr., on 5/21/10, ORDERING that pltfs' complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED(Kastilahn, A)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 3/2/10 ORDERING dfts' motions to dismiss 20 22 are granted in part and denied in part and dft Quicken's Motion to Strike 25 is DENIED; pltfs are granted 15 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint; and dfts are granted 30 days from the date of service of pltfs' amended complaint to file a response. (Carlos, K)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR SANCTIONS signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 2/26/2010 ORDERING Mr. Carey to personally pay sanctions in the amount of $150.00. This sanction is personal to the attorney, is to be borne by him personally, and is not to be transmitted to the client by way of a charge of attorneys fees and/or costs. Not later than 20 days from the filing of this Order, plaintiffs' counsel shall file a declaration attesting to his compliance with the terms of this Order.(Matson, R)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 1/5/10 ORDERING the hearings as to 20 Motion to Dismiss, 22 Motion to Dismiss, and 25 Motion to Strike are CONTINUED 2/12/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Da mrell Jr. Plaintiffs' counsel is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why he should not be sanctioned in the amount of $150 for failing to file an opposition or notice of non-opposition to defendants' motions in compliance with LR 230(c). Show Cause Response due by 1/29/2010. A hearing on the order to show cause, if necessary, will follow the hearing on the motions. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Somera, et al. v. Indymac Federal Bank, FSB, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Somera
Represented By: Philip Eugene Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores L Somera
Represented By: Philip Eugene Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Federal Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?