Pollard v. Anderson Police Dept et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Byford Pollard, III
Defendant: Anderson Police Dept and Shasta County Superior Court
Case Number: 2:2009cv01955
Filed: July 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/26/2021 DENYING 73 Motion to Reopen Case. (Coll, A)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/25/10 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 05/06/10 recommending that Anderson Police Department be dismissed as a defendant to this action. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell; Objections due within 20 days. (Plummer, M)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/14/09; John Nevens added. Shasta County Superior Court terminated; Second amended complaint due within 30 days. (Owen, K)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kenneth Byford Pollard, III, signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/27/09. The Sheriff of Shasta County is to collect monthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order, the order granting ifp and copy of pltf's IFP on the Sheriff of Shasta County. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/18/09 ORDERING that pltf's 8 request for appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Yin, K)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/6/09 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollard v. Anderson Police Dept et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Byford Pollard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?