Chan v. County of Sacramento et al

Plaintiff: Mady Chan
Defendant: County of Sacramento, John McGinness, Antonio C Amador, US Marshal, Ortiz and Gary Yandell
Case Number: 2:2009cv02006
Filed: July 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/14/12 GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Transcripts at Government Expense. The court reporter is directed to provide Plaintiff with a transcript of the 12/15/11 hearing. (Becknal, R)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 02/22/12 ordering plaintiff's in forma pauperis status shall continue. The clerk shall serve this order upon the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, Case No. 12-15250. (cc: USCA-9th circuit)(Plummer, M)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/8/2012 RECOMMENDING that this action be stayed and this case administratively closed; and the parties to notify the court within 14 days of the appeal being resolved. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER directing the United States Marshal's Office to produce inmate, Mady Chan, for a hearing on December 15, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S) (cc - certified copy to USM)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/22/2011 GRANTING 96 Motion for 20-Day Extension of Time. Supplemental Briefing as set forth in the 88 Memorandum and Order due by 11/30/2011. Motion Hearing as to Plaintiff's 56 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction CONTINUED until 12/15/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Michel, G)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 95 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/20/11. (Plummer, M)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/28/11 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court resend 87 , 88 , 89 , 90 , 91 and 92 to plaintiff at the new address.(Dillon, M)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/21/11 ORDERING that by Wednesday, 10/26/11, defendants shall provide a statement to the court describing either why plaintiff is not receiving his mail or resolving whatever issue was impeding the delivery of the mail. (Dillon, M)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/6/2011 ORDERING that the Court finds oral argument is necessary to reach a decision on Plaintiff's 56 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Hearin g on this matter is hereby set before this Court at 2:00 p.m. on Thursday, November 3, 2011, in Courtroom 7. Not later than Thursday, October 20, 2011, the parties are to submit simultaneous supplemental briefing, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages, on the issues as directed in this order.(Duong, D)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/4/2011 ORDERING that the dispositive motions deadline is now set for 12/27/2011; pretrial conference and trial dates will be set as appropriate. (Yin, K)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/5/11 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief should be granted in that defendants should arrange an appointment with an outside dentist or facility where plaintiff should receive all necessary dental treatment as more fully set forth above. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/17/11 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court send the records to Dr. William Couch; Dr. Couch shall provide a written report to the court within 28 days, discussing if the dental care that plaintiff received violated the Eighth Amendment bar on cruel and unusual punishment.(Dillon, M)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/21/2011 ADOPTING 74 Findings and Recommendations. Pltf's 56 Motion for TRO is DENIED in part. (Zignago, K.)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/31/11 ORDERING that defendants shall provide to the court a copy of plaintiffs entire dental records including, but not limited to, paper records and X-Rays, within 21 days. (Dillon, M)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 03/29/11 recommending that plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (preliminary injunction) 56 be denied in part, in that the claims regarding the Buddha altar and Buddhism study classes be denied. Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 56 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/15/11 ORDERING that, upon reconsideration, the Magistrate Judge's order of 1/20/11, is AFFIRMED and Plaintiff's MOTION 66 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/9/11 ORDERING that plaintiff may file a response to defendants briefing within 7 days from the date of this order. (Dillon, M)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 01/20/11 ORDERING that plf's 57 Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED IN PART; the 65 10/01/10 second amended complaint will be the operative complaint. Defendants, if they wish, may file a supplemental answer to the second amended complaint w/i 28 days. No new dfts will be added and no further amendments will be allowed. Plf's 58 Motion for Contempt is DENIED; w/i 28 days, dfts shall reply to the 56 Motion for TRO solely with respect to the dental claims. (Benson, A.)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/29/10 ordering the 12/27/10 dispositive motion deadline is vacated and shall be reset pending a ruling on plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint. (Plummer, M)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/14/10 ORDERING that the 49 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED in full. Pltf's claim regarding the Buddha alter contained in his 48 Motion is DENIED. (Owen, K)
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/26/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 41 motion for the appointment of an expert witness is DENIED; pltf's 43 motion to amend is DENIED; and RECOMMENDING that pltf's 38 motion for class certification be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/27/10 ORDERING that, upon reconsideration, the order of the magistrate judge filed 7/8/10, 42 , is affirmed. (Becknal, R)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/8/2010 DENYING pltf's motions 34 for sanctions, 38 for appointment of counsel, 40 for the court to make a ruling. (Yin, K) Modified on 7/9/2010 (Plummer, M).
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/1/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 23 motion for sanctions is DENIED; w/in 7 days, the USM shall inform the court of status of service; the clerk to serve a copy of this order on the USM, the Acting U.S. Marshall shall respond personally. (cc: USM) (Yin, K)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/19/10 ORDERING that within seven days of the date of this order, the U.S. Marshal shall inform the court of the status of service; Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (Dillon, M)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/7/09 DIRECTING USM to serve Amended Complaint filed on 9/4/09, on County of Sacramento, and Ortiz, within 10 days. Clerk of the Court shall serve upon plaintiff a copy of the Local Rules of Court. (cc USM)(Dillon, M)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/30/09 ORDERING that 11 Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED; 11 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED; All claims in the amended complaint but for 5, 6 and 8 are dismissed; Servi ce is appropriate for defendants Sacramento County, Ortiz. Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff 2 USM-285 forms, one summons,an instruction sheet and a copy of the amended complaint filed 9/8/09. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the Notice of Submission of Documents and submit the appropriate documents to the court.(Dillon, M)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/21/09 ORDERING that pltf's 8 request to proceed IFP is GRANTED; pltf to pay the $350.00 filing fee w/ an initial partial filing fee of $74.47 to be collected in accordance w/ t he concurrent Sacramento County Sheriff's order; but for pltf's claim alleging inadequate dental care against Sacramento County, the cmplt is dismissed, w/ leave to file an amended cmplt w/in 30 days; pltf's 6 motion to have this action certified as a clas action is VACATED w/out prejudice; and pltf's 6 motion for appointment of counselis DENIED. (Yin, K)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/29/09 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed IFP; and Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chan v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mady Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McGinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio C Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Yandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?