Johnson v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Chester Johnson
Defendant: J. Lee, C. Orrick and M.A. Chirila
Case Number: 2:2009cv02076
Filed: July 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/26/2013 ORDERING that defendants' 39 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; and the Clerk to enter judgment for defendants and close the case. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/24/12 denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. (See order for further details) (Plummer, M)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/25/11 GRANTING 28 Motion for Extension; ORDERING that Discovery due by 12/8/2011; Dispositive Motions filed by 3/1/2012.(Dillon, M)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/12/11 ordering that plaintiff's claims against defendant Orrick are dismissed without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Chester Johnson signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/09/11. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/18/10 DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Williams, D)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/25/2010 ORDERING that pltf has 30 days to file the required trust acct statement; the clerk to send pltf a new ifp form. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Orrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A. Chirila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?