January 23, 2017 |
Filing
92
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/20/2017 DISCHARGING the 1/12/2016 order to show cause; and the costs of personal service in the amount of $137.18 are taxed against defendant Wever. (cc: USM)(Yin, K)
|
December 9, 2016 |
Filing
91
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/09/16 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution and failure to comply withy court rules and orders. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
October 13, 2016 |
Filing
90
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/12/2016 ORDERING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, within 30 days why the action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution.(Yin, K)
|
January 12, 2016 |
Filing
86
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/11/16 ORDERING that the United States Marshal shall submit a report in writing within 30 days of the date of this order on the status of service of defendant Wever. Also within 30 days of the date of this order, the United States Marshal shall show causein writing why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with the courts prior orders. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order, along with copies of the courts May 21, 2013, and July 6, 2015, orders (Docs. 77 and 85 ), on the United States Marshal. (Dillon, M)
|
July 6, 2015 |
Filing
85
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/2/2015 ORDERING the USM to submit a report within 30 days, on the status of service of defendant Wever. (cc: USM-SAC)(Yin, K)
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing
83
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/10/14 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of the courts May 21, 2013, order (Doc. 77 ) on the United States Marshal.(Dillon, M)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing
77
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/20/2013 DENYING the United States Marshal's 75 request; the United States Marshal shall (a) personally serve process and a copy of this order; and (b) file, whithin 14 days after personal service is effected, the return of service. (See Order for Details) (cc: USM)(Yin, K)
|
October 9, 2012 |
Filing
68
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/9/12 ORDERING that the August 8, 2012, findings and recommendations are VACATED; Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time 64 to file objections to the August 8, 2012, findings and re commendations is DENIED as unnecessary; The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff two USM-285 forms; and within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the provided USM-285 forms one for each defendant and return them to the court.(Dillon, M)
|
August 24, 2012 |
Filing
66
ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/23/2012 ORDERING that the 62 findings and recommendations filed 6/26/2012, are ADOPTED in full. This action shall proceed as against defendants Sandra Lee Wever and William Proffitt only. The following defendants are DISMISSED: Mary Daved, James Bueler, Shawn Webber, Maria Webber, and Dave Wever. (Zignago, K.)
|
August 8, 2012 |
Filing
63
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/07/12 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court orders. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
June 26, 2012 |
Filing
62
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/25/12 recommending that this action proceed against defendant Wever and Proffitt only and that all other defendants be dismissed. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
November 16, 2011 |
Filing
55
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/15/2011 ORDERING that plaintiff's second amended complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice; and plaintiff shall file a complete amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
|
September 6, 2011 |
Filing
53
ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/6/11 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed 6/22/11, are adopted except as modified above; Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff is granted leave of forty-five (45) days from the issuance of this order to file his second amended complaint. (Becknal, R)
|
June 22, 2011 |
Filing
51
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/22/11 recommending that this action be dismissed and that any pending motions be denied as moot. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 20 days. (Plummer, M)
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/18/10 ordering that plaintiff shall file a complete amended complaint, in which all claims and defendants are listed in a single document, within 30 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
|
September 30, 2010 |
Filing
37
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/29/10 denying 25 Motion. (Dillon, M)
|
May 7, 2010 |
Filing
34
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 05/06/10 recommending that this action be dismissed and that all pending motions be denied as moot. MOTION Order for Sanctions, contempt compliance and Default Judgment 25 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 20 days. (Plummer, M)
|
November 10, 2009 |
Filing
20
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Lee Wilson signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/9/09. Butte County Jail is to collect monthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on Butte County Jail. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
16
[VACATED PURSUANT TO 19 ORDER] FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/21/2009 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders; objections due within 20 days. (Suttles, J) Modified on 10/27/2009 (Manzer, C). Modified on 11/10/2009 (Yin, K).
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing
10
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/1/09 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
|
September 1, 2009 |
Filing
7
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/31/09 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
|