September 27, 2013 |
Filing
88
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/26/13 ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(A)(ii), each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
July 26, 2013 |
Filing
85
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/25/13 ordering the court's 07/23/13 order is vacated. The parties shall file all dispositional documents in this case within 60 days of the date of this order. Alternatively, if the dispositional documents are not ready by that time, the parties shall file a status report explaining the status of the parties' settlement agreement(s) and their dispositional documents. (Plummer, M)
|
March 28, 2013 |
Filing
82
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/27/2013 ADOPTING 80 Findings and Recommendations in full; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Michel, G)
|
March 13, 2013 |
Filing
80
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/13/13 ORDERING plaintiff's motion to strike 50 is denied as unnecessary. If defendant CFMG seeks to introduce Dr. Gould's declaration or testimony at t rial, plaintiff may renew any objections at that time. Defendant's motion to strike 58 is denied as unnecessary. If plaintiff seeks to introduce Debbie Parkison's declaration or testimony at trial, defendant may renew any objections at that time. Plaintiff's motion to supplement 62 is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant's motion for summary judgment 31 be granted to the extent plaintiff's complaint could be construed as presenting an inadequate medical car e claim with respect to the administration and discontinuation of Trazodone during plaintiff's confinement at BCJ; and defendant's motion for summary judgment 31 be denied and the case proceed on plaintiff's claim that defendant CFMG failed to treat and provide follow-up care with respect to his seizure disorder in violation of the Fourteenth Amendment and State law. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 31 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 7 days.(Plummer, M)
|
January 8, 2013 |
Filing
78
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/7/2013. The 3/18/2013 Jury Trial was VACATED pursuant to Court's 11/30/2012 73 Order and RE-SET 1/27/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7. Parties shall file Trial Briefs no later than 10/31/2013. Accordingly, 1/24/2013 Final Pretrial Conference is VACATED and CONTINUED to 11/14/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7. Joint Final Pretrial Statement due no later than 10/242013 and shall comply with procedures outlined in Court� 39;s 47 Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order. The personal appearances of trial attorneys or person(s) in pro se is mandatory for the Final Pretrial Conference. Telephonic appearances for this hearing are NOT permitted. Any Evidentiary or Procedural Motion shall be filed by 10/24/2013. Oppositions must be filed by 10/31/2013 and any Reply must be filed by 11/7/2013. Motions will be heard at same time as Final PretrialConference. (Marciel, M)
|
November 30, 2012 |
Filing
73
STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify Order Continuing Trial signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/30/12. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
October 3, 2012 |
Filing
71
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/2/2012 ORDERING Jury Trial Reset for 3/18/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr., trial briefs due by 1/10/2013; Final Pretrial Conference Reset for 1/24/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr., Joint Final Pretrial Statement due 1/3/2013; any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 1/3/2013, Oppositions by 1/10/2013, any reply by 1/17/2013.(Reader, L)
|
May 1, 2012 |
Filing
49
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/1/2012 GRANTING 48 Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment 31 , 42 ; Plaintiff's motion for the court to conti nue the law and motion hearing date scheduled in this matter from 5/11/2012, to 5/25/2012 is GRANTED; and Plaintiff shall file any opposition papers no later than 15 days prior to 5/25/2012 law and motion hearing date Defendants shall file a reply, if any, in accordance with Local Rule 230(d).(Reader, L)
|
April 11, 2012 |
Filing
47
AMENDED ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/10/12 CONTINUING Jury Trial to 1/14/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr; trial briefs due 11/1/12; Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 11/15/2012 at 0 2:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr; personal appearances of trial attorneys mandatory; Joint Final Pretrial Statement due 10/25/12; evidentiary or procedural motions due 10/25/2012; oppositions due 11/1/12; replies due 11/8/12. (Meuleman, A)
|
November 7, 2011 |
Filing
30
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 11/4/11 ORDERING the Jury Trial ADVANCED to 6/25/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; the parties shall file trial briefs not later than 4/19/ 2012; the Final Pretrial Conference is ADVANCED to 5/3/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; the Joint Final Pretrial Statement is DUE not later than 4/12/2012; any evidentiary or procedural motions are due by 4/12/2012, oppositions are due by 4/19/2012, and any reply is due by 4/26/2012. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. (Kastilahn, A)
|
November 5, 2010 |
Filing
29
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/04/10 ordering plaintiff's ROES 1-10 are dismissed. (Pretrial Motions filed by 4/6/2012, Discovery due by 8/31/2011, Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/30/2011, Defenda nts shall disclose experts on or before 10/15/11, any supplemental experts shall be disclosed on or before 11/05/11, Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England J, Jury Trial set for 11/5/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.) (Plummer, M)
|
September 24, 2010 |
Filing
23
ORDERsigned by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/23/10 ordering a Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is set for 10/29/10 at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 27 before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Counsel on behalf of each party shall appear at the status conference. Plaintiff shall file and serve a status report on or before 10/15/10 and defendants shall file and serve status reports on or before 10/22/10.(Plummer, M)
|
August 31, 2010 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/30/10 vacating 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff's counsel shall file a report explaining whether defendant California Medical Group has been served with the complaint. (Plummer, M)
|
August 26, 2010 |
Filing
19
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/13/10 ORDERING the clerk of the court shall randomly assign a District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice as to defendant California Forensic Medical Group. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
|
June 23, 2010 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/17/10 ORDERING that the 12 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED; Plaintiffs counsel shall file, within 30 days of the date of this order, a second status report explaining whether defendant California Forensic Medical Group has been served.(Dillon, M)
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing
12
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/25/2010 ORDERING that w/in 21 days, pltfs to file and serve a status report; and pltfs' counsel to Show Cause in writing why sanctions should not be imposed for the failure to timely file and serve a status report in accordance w/ the 2/11/10 court's order. (Yin, K)
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/10/2010 ORDERING the clerk to ISSUE summonses for dfts Butte Cnty Sheriff's Dpt, Marten, Jones, and CA Forensic Medical Grp and send to pltf's counsel, the clerk to also send pltf's c ounsel 5 copies of the Order re Consent to Magistrate Judge form w/ this order; pltf to complete service w/in 60 days; dfts reply to the cmplt w/in the time provided by F.R.Civ.P. 12(a); pltf's status report due w/in 90 days, dfts' status report due 30 days thereafter; a motion or opposition supported by unsigned affidavits or declarations will be stricken.(Yin, K)
|