August 24, 2011 |
Filing
107
FINAL JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/23/2011; Defendants are ordered to pay disgorgement of ill-gotten gains, interest, and penalties in accordance with this judgment within 10 days to the Securities and Exchange Commission; dft Souza, individually, shall pay civil penalty within 14 days; this court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing this judgment. (Michel, G)
|
August 8, 2011 |
Filing
106
DEFAULT JUDGMENT against D.A. Souza Investments, LLC, David A. Souza signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/5/2011. (Michel, G)
|
June 3, 2011 |
Filing
102
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/2/11, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for default judgment 98 be granted; the proposed final judgment as to defendants David A. Souza and D.A. Souza Investments, L LC (98-5] be adopted; a civil penalty against defendant Souza be imposed in the amount of $946,928.28; and this case be closed. Matter referred to Judge Mueller. Within 14 days after these findings and recommendations are filed, any party may file written objections with the court. (Kastilahn, A)
|
March 11, 2011 |
Filing
94
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/10/11 GRANTING 82 Motion for Sanctions; 36 Answer to Complaint filed by David A. Souza is STICKEN and DEFAULT entered against David A. Souza. (Williams, D)
|
January 19, 2011 |
Filing
88
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/19/11 ORDERING that, as it appears dft may not have been served with the 84 12/20/10 Order, plf is GRANTED further extension of time until 02/02/11 to file his opposition to the 82 Motion for Sanctions. Clerk is to serve dft at: 3626 Railroad Ave., Redding, CA 96001. (address updated). (Benson, A.)
|
December 20, 2010 |
Filing
84
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/18/10 ORDERING that the dft's opposition to pltf's 82 Motion for Sanctions is due on or before 1/12/11; the Clerk is directed to add dft's new address for service. (Manzer, C)
|
September 22, 2010 |
Filing
80
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/21/2010. Defendant David Souza shall serve Initial Disclosures, serve written Responses without Objections to plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, and produce all responsive documents no later than 10/1/2010. Failure to comply with this Order may result in imposition of sanctions. (Marciel, M) Modified on 9/22/2010 (Marciel, M).
|
September 8, 2010 |
Filing
69
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against D.A. Souza Investments, LLC signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/7/10. (Owen, K)
|
September 2, 2010 |
Filing
67
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/2/10: The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the declaration filed June 8, 2010 (docket no. 45) on defendant David A. Souza at 824 Twin View Blvd., Redding, CA 96003. (Kaminski, H)
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr., on 6/2/10, ORDERING that 42 the motion of Roger V. Jaffe to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED. Counsel must advise dft D.A. Souza Investment, LLC of the possibility of default pursuant to LR 183(a). Counsel shall file a declaration regarding compliance within 10 days of issuance of this order. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller for case mgmnt and recommendation(s) to the district judge. (Kastilahn, A)
|
December 16, 2009 |
Filing
29
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 12/16/09 ORDERING dfts David Souza and Souza Investments LLC shall have a further extension of time, through and including 3/31/10 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint; the deadline for parties to file the Joint Status Report in this action shall be extended through and including, 3/31/10. (Carlos, K)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing
25
STIPULATION and ORDER (Modified from Submitted Version) signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 10/27/2009. Defendants shall have a further extension of time, though and including 12/14/2009, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The parties have until 12/14/2009 to file their Joint Status Report. (Krueger, M)
|
October 21, 2009 |
Filing
21
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 10/21/2009 ORDERING 19 that Defendants may have an additional week, to and including 10/26/2009, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action. (Reader, L)
|
October 15, 2009 |
Filing
17
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 10/14/09 GRANTING 15 Stipulation and Proposed Order; Defendants may have an additional week, to and includeing 10/19/09, to answer or otherwise respond to complaint. (Owen, K)
|
October 5, 2009 |
Filing
13
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 10/2/2009 GRANTING 11 Stipulation and Proposed Order; Defendants may have an additional week, to and including 10/13/2009, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Matson, R)
|