Lukas et al v. United Behavioral Health et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Lukas and Joyce Watters
Defendant: United Behavioral Health and IBM Medical and Dental Employee Welfare Benefit Plans
Case Number: 2:2009cv02423
Filed: August 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/9/13 ORDERING that the deadline for Plaintiffs to file a Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs and Prejudgment Interest is continued by 14 days from 4/15/2013 to 4/29/2013. (Kastilahn, A)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/15/13 ORDERING that plaintiffs be awarded benefits for Lukas' stay in Alta Mira at 50 percent of the usual and prevailing rate for 45 days for a total of $12,825.00. Plaintiffs shall foll ow the procedures set forth in Local Rule 293 for recovering their attorney fees. Any request for prejudgment interest on the award of benefits is to be determined on plaintiffs' application for attorney fees. (Meuleman, A) Modified on 3/18/2013 (Meuleman, A).
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE: COSTS signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/25/2011 ORDERING that costs of $727.20 will be allowed. (Zignago, K.)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM of DECISION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/14/2011. Plaintiffs are to take nothing on their claims and Judgment is entered in favor of defendants. This action is TERMINATED. (Marciel, M)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/25/11: Trial RESET for 3/10/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/22/10 ORDERING that the documents comprising the trial exhibits (including the Administrative Record) submitted to the Court with Motion to Seal Documents, shall be filed under SEAL. The Court DECLINES the Request to to seal the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of the Motion to Seal Documents. The court also declines to order all trial briefing in this matter to be filed under seal, subject to reconsideration after the court has an oppo rtunity to review the matters set forth in the briefing. The parties should be apprised that it is not the court's intention to take the highly unusual step of sealing its findings of fact, conclusions of law, or order setting forth the reasons for its final judgment in this matter.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lukas et al v. United Behavioral Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lukas
Represented By: Lisa Sue Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Watters
Represented By: Lisa Sue Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBM Medical and Dental Employee Welfare Benefit Plans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?