August 16, 2010 |
Filing
68
ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/13/10 ORDERING that a certificate of appealability should not issue in this action. (Becknal, R)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing
65
ORDER DENYING 64 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/14/2010. (Matson, R)
|
June 11, 2010 |
Filing
61
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 06/11/10 ordering that petitioner's 06/04/10 request that his notice of voluntary dismissal 59 be disregarded is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
June 4, 2010 |
Filing
58
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/4/2010 ORDERING that pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41 (a), this action is DISMISSED; the 5/26/10 order is VACATED, rendering moot respondent's 57 motion for extension of time; the clerk to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing
55
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/27/10 ORDERING respondent to notify this court, w/in 7 days, whether respondent has any objection to the dismissal of this action.(Yin, K)
|
May 26, 2010 |
Filing
54
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/26/10 ORDERING that petitioners 52 request for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice; Petitioners 52 motion for a TRO/preliminary injunctive relief regarding access to the law library/courts is construed as a motion for aprotective order and, as such and as modified by the court, is GRANTED;Respondent must inform the court within 7 days of steps taken to assure that petitioner has adequate access to the law library for him to be able to frame objections to the pending findings and recommendations in the instant case; and Petitioners deadline for filing objections to the April 12, 2010 findings and recommendations is extended until 6/7/10. (Dillon, M)
|
April 12, 2010 |
Filing
48
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/9/2010 ORDERING that ptnr's 9 motion for bail pending adjudication of his habeas and his 10 , 25 motions to restrict his transfer during the pendency of his hc proceedings are DENIED; ptnr's 2 , 41 motions for appointment of counsel are DENIED w/out prejudice; ptnr's 31 , 33 , 42 , 43 inapposite motion for default judgment/entry of default are DISREGARDED; ptnr's 7 inappos ite motion, entitled "motion for relief based on victims rights" is DISREGARDED; ptnr's 12 , 24 "motion to correct error" are DENIED; ptnr's 38 , 40 motions for evidentiary hearing are DENIED; and ptnr's 47 "request for recall of commitment recommendation" is DENIED; and RECOMMENDING that the habeas petition be dismissed. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days.(Yin, K)
|
October 15, 2009 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/15/09 ordering the clerk of the court is to substitute DVI Warden S.M. Salinas in for Sacramento County Sheriff McGinness as respondent in this action. Respondent is directed to provide a res ponse to petitioner's habeas petition within 21 days. The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order, the consent form and a copy of the complaint, construed as a petition for writ of habeas corpus on Michael Farrell, Senior Assistant Attorney General. (cc: Michael Farrell, Attorney General) (Plummer, M)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing
6
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/15/09 ORDERING that 3 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Clerk of the Court is to re-designate this case as a habeas petition brought pursuant to 28 US.C. § 2254; Clerk of the Court is to serve a copy of this order and the instant petition by mail both upon John McGinness, the Sheriff of Sacramento County, as well as upon County Counsel, County of Sacramento. The Sheriff has 20 days from the date of this order to file a response to petitioners request for immediate release.(Dillon, M)
|