Norwood v Nanganama, et al.,
Plaintiff: Gregory Norwood
Defendant: Nanganama, T. Byers, Salmi, Raman and Kaur
Case Number: 2:2009cv02929
Filed: October 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/17/16 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Gregory Norwood at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 6 before Judge John A. Mendez. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Dillon, M)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/4/16 ORDERING that, upon reconsideration, the order of the magistrate judge filed November 18, 2015 (ECF No. 153), is affirmed. (Becknal, R)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 AMENDED ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/17/2015 ORDERING the previous 155 writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum is VACATED; the custodian shall produce Gregory Norewood J- 53407, to testify in USDC at 8:30 a.m. on April 11, 2016 in courtroom 6, before Judge John A. Mendez; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and Warden. (cc: OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/30/15 ordering the custodian to produce Gregory Norwood on 1/25/16 at 8:30 a.m. in courtroom 6 before District Judge John A. Mendez. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Plummer, M)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/18/15 DENYING 145 Motion for an expert witness.(Dillon, M)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/28/15 ORDERING that Defendants' Request that Staff Counsel Suzanne Pyne appear telephonically at the 8/6/15 Settlement Conferece 142 is GRANTED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/18/15 ordering the Custodian to produce Gregory Norwood on 08/06/15 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: EFB and OTCD) (Plummer, M)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/21/15 ORDERING that within 14 days the parties shall each file a signed Notice Regarding Waiver of Disqualification, indicating whether they will agree to the undersigned serving as the settlement judge. (Benson, A)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/13/2014 DENYING plaintiff's Motions 112 for Relief from Judgment and 119 for Reconsideration. (Marciel, M)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/8/2014 ADOPTING IN FULL, except as noted in this order, 110 Findings and Recommendations; DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff's conspiracy claim alleged in the 108 Third Amended Complaint; DISMI SSING WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff's renewed Eighth Amendment Claims against Defendants Nanganama and Byers; ORDERING Defendant Kaur to file a response, within thirty (30) days, to the Eighth Amendment claim raised in the 108 Third Amended Complaint. (Michel, G)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/22/13 RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs conspiracy claim alleged in the third amended complaint be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; Plaintiffs renewed Eighth Amendment claims against defendants Nanganama and Byers be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the previous orders of this court, ECF Nos. 47 , 107 ; If the District Judge adopts these findings and recommen dation, defendant shall file a response to plaintiffs third amended complaint alleging an Eighth Amendment claim against defendant NP Kaur, within thirty days from the date of said adoption. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Dillon, M)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 9/12/2013 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 103 are ADOPTED in FULL; Plaintiff's 102 motion for leave to file a surreply is DENIED; Defendants' 101 motion to strike unauthorized surreply is GRA NTED; Defendant Byers's joinder 90 is GRANTED; Defendant' 87 motion to dismiss is GRANTED in PART; Defendants Dr. Salmi and Byers are DISMISSED from this action; and Plaintiff's second amended complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend as to NP Kaur only. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days to file an amended complaint against defendant NP Kaur. (Reader, L)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/28/2013 DENYING plaintiff's 97 motion to appoint counsel; and RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 102 motion for leave to file a surreply be denied; defend ants' 101 motion to strike unauthorized surreply be granted; defendant Byers's 90 joinder be granted; defendants' 87 motion to dismiss be granted in part; defendants Dr. Salmi and Byers be dismissed from this action; and plaintiff's second amended complaint be dismissed with leave to amend as to NP Kaur only. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections to F&R due within 28 days. (Yin, K)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 07/13/12 vacating 70 Motion for Summary Judgment and vacating 75 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Defendant may re-notice his motion for summary judgment when the remaining defendants have been served and a dispositive motion has been filed. (Plummer, M)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/11/12 ORDERING that this matter is REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge to determine whether defendant's proposed Reply should be late-filed and considered as part of the summary judgment motion. (Kastilahn, A)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/18/2012 RECOMMENDING that defendant's 70 motion for summary judgment be denied; a further scheduling order will be issued if these findings and recommendations are adopted. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 02/24/12 ordering that plaintiff must file an opposition to the summary judgment motion within 28 days. (Plummer, M)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/6/12 ORDERING that the U.S. Marshal shall use all means necessary and proper to serve Dr. Salmi and Dr. Kaur as set forth in Judge Karltons February 3, 2012, Order; The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of the this Order and the February 3, 2012, Order 67 on the U.S. Marshal. (cc USM)(Dillon, M)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/2/12; This matter is returned to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings not inconsistent with this order. a. This court sua sponte grants plaintiff leave to amend his First Amended Complaint, withi n thirty (30) days of the date of this order. If plaintiff chooses to amend the complaint, it must contain sufficient allegations against all the defendants plaintiff intends to sue. If plaintiff chooses not to amend the complaint, the lawsuit will proceed on the First Amended Complaint against defendant Byers only, and Kaur and Salmi will be dismissed from the case. b. Plaintiff shall be afforded an opportunity to serve Dr. Salmi (with the assistance of the U.S. Marshals Service), at the Regis try of Physician Specialists, 1299 Newell Hill Place, Suite 100, Walnut Creek, CA. c. If service is not effected on Dr. Kaur and Dr. Salmi within ninety (90) days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a declaration listing the actions he took to serve them. Plaintiff must show that he diligently attempted to effect service. Plaintiff's declaration shall list the addresses where he requested that service be made. The Magistrate Judge shall thereupon ensure that the U.S. Marshals Service has exhausted all available means of effecting service, including personal service. (Matson, R)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/30/12 ORDERING that within 14 days defendant Byers shall state if he intends to file a dispositive motion. (Dillon, M)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/8/11 Recommending that Plaintiff's MOTION for the Court to effectuate Service 59 be denied. And Defend Kaur and Salmi be dismissed from this action. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Within fourteen days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written Objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/18/2011 ADOPTING 56 Findings and Recommendations in full. Dft Dr. Ramen is DISMISSED from this action. (Zignago, K.)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/26/2011 ORDERING that the Court DECLINES to adopt 53 Findings and Recommendations. Pltf is GRANTED 90 days to serve dfts Kaur and Salmi. If Pltf is unable to do so, he must file within 90 days a declaration listing the actions he took to serve them. Pltf must demonstrate that he diligently attempted service. (Zignago, K.)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 05/09/11 ORDERING that the amended complaint filed on 05/02/11, is the operative complaint in this case. Defendant Byers may stand on his existing answer or file an amended answer within 14 days. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant Dr. Ramen be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 04/14/11 ORDERING that within 28 days of service of this order, plaintiff may file an amended complaint as discussed in the 11/18/10 order and findings and recommendations. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants Kaur and Salmi be dismissed from this action pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/11/11 ORDERING the Findings and Recommendations 45 ADOPTED IN FULL; dfts' Motion to Dismiss 21 is GRANTED; dfts Nanganama and Raman are DISMISSED, but pltf may file an amended complaint with respect to Ramen at a future date to be determined by the court. (Carlos, K)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/17/10 ORDERING plaintiff's motion for an expert witness 20 is denied. Defendants' motion to strike 29 is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that defend ants' motion to dismiss 21 be granted in that: Defendant Nanganama is dismissed for plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies; Defendant Ramen is dismissed, but plaintiff may file an amended complaint with respect to Ramen at a future date to be determined by the court. MOTION to DISMISS 21 referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/18/10. (Plummer, M)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/21/10 granting 34 Motion for court intervention. The clerk of the court shall sign the annexed subpoena and serve this order and the subpoena on Jaime Michelle Ganson of the Attorney Genera l's Office, the attorney of record on this case. Jaime Michelle Ganson of the Attorney General's Office shall serve forthwith this order and subpoena on the Director of CDCR, and by 10/15/10, the Director of CDCR shall provide to the court, if available, documents concerning the business address for Dr. Salmi, Dr. S Kaur and Physician's Assistant Timothy Byers, or in the alternative, the business address may simply be disclosed. (Plummer, M)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/22/09 DIRECTING USM to serve * complaint * filed on * 10/21/09,* on * Nanganama, T. Byers, Salmi, Raman, Kaur*. (cc: USM). (Plummer, M)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERsigned by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/17/09 ORDERING that pltf's 4 request to proceed IFP is GRANTED; pltf to pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance w/ the concurrent CDC order; service is appropriate for dfts Nanganama, T. Byers, Salmi, Raman and Kaur; the clerk to send pltf forms for service to be completed and returned w/in 30 days along w/ the Notice of Submission. (Yin, K)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/2/09 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwood v Nanganama, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanganama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?