Jones v. Dazo et al

Plaintiff: Julius Jones
Defendant: A. Dazo, I. Cardeno, T. Butler, S. Reddy, L. Holloway, M. Kramer and Bradley
Case Number: 2:2009cv02974
Filed: October 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/10/11 RECOMMENDING that this case be dismissed re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Julius Jones. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/15/2010 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 10 are hereby VACATED; A motion for substitution of a proper party must be made within 90 days. (Reader, L)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 8/6/2010 ADOPTING 9 Findings and Recommendations in full. Dfts Holloway, Bradley, Casey, Cardeno, Butler and Kramer are DISMISSED from this action. (Zignago, K.)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/5/2010 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed w/out prejudice; Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/14/2010 ORDERING that service is appropriate for dfts Dazo and Reddy; the clerk to send pltf forms for service to be completed and returned w/in 28 days, along w/ the Notice of Submission; the clerk to assign a District Judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that dfts Holloway, Bradley, Casey, Cardeno, Butler and Kramer be dismissed from this action. Assigned and Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/17/09 ORDERING the clerk to provide pltf w/ another ifp application; and pltf to submit w/in 30 days a fully completed ifp application.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Dazo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Dazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Cardeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?