Pierce v. Sprouts Cafe, Inc.
Plaintiff: Annette Pierce
Defendant: Sprouts Cafe, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv03002
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER 47 for Dismissal signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 10/27/2010. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice and each party to bear their own attorneys fees and costs. (Marciel, M)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/3/10 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION TO AMEND its answer 31 is GRANTED. Defendant shall file and serve its amended answer in accordance with this order within 15 days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 6/30/2010 re 32 ORDERING that Case Referred to VDRP. (cc LM)(Duong, D)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 12/29/09: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/22/2010. Discovery due by 11/1/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. Jury Trial set for 8/9/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Sprouts Cafe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Pierce
Represented By: Jeffery Allen Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprouts Cafe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?