Turner v. California Forensic Medical Group et al
Plaintiff: Anthony R. Turner
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group, - Zil, Jodell Jencks, Tammy, Genine, Carolyn, Lisa and Kathrine Owens
Case Number: 2:2009cv03040
Filed: November 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/26/14 DENYING 83 , 96 amd 102 motions to appoint counsel.(Dillon, M)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/26/2014 ORDERING that the 126 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED in full. Plaintiff's 88 , 104 and 123 motions for temporary restraining order and injunction are DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/5/14 RECOMMENDING that defendants renewed motion for terminating sanctions 89 be granted, this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders, and that all pending motions be denied as moot. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/24/14 RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs motions for temporary restraining order and injunction (Docs. 88 , 104 , 123 ) be denied. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/18/2013 ORDERING that the 81 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED IN FULL. Defendants' unopposed 76 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants Carolyn Viera, Janeene Barela, John Zil, Lisa Miguel-Sevall, Tammy Owens and William Douglas. This action shall continue as to defendants Malagoni, Deneau, Hundl and Brace only. (Zignago, K.)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/25/13 granting 68 Motion to Compel. The requests for admissions, set 2, propounded on plaintiff 04/24/12, for which no response was received are deemed admitted. Plaintiff shall within 30 days of the date of this order, serve his responses to the defendants' request for production of documents, set one, and special interrogatories, set one, on defendants without objections. Plaintiff shall within 30 days of the date of this orde r, serve adequate responses to the request for admissions, set one, on defendants without objections. If no response is received, or if an inadequate response is received, from plaintiff, defendants may file a renewed motion for sanctions within 14 days of the date the responses are due. The scheduling order is modified so that any dispositive motions shall be filed within 90 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/18/13 recommending that defendants' unopposed motion for summary judgment 76 be granted. Judgement be entered in favor of the moving defendants. This action continue as to defendants Malagoni, Deneau, Hundl and Brace only. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 76 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 6/13/2012 ORDERING that the 66 findings and recommendations filed 5/3/2012, are ADOPTED in full. Plaintiff's 63 motion for a writ of mandamus is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/2/2012 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 63 motion for writ of mandamus be denied. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 04/30/12 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to randomly assign a District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell randomly assigned to this action. The new case number is 2:09-cv-3040 GEB CMK (PC). (Plummer, M)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/23/2011 DENYING, without prejudice 27 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. (Michel, G)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 56 Motion for an order of contempt signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/09/11. (Plummer, M)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 21 Motion for documents signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/12/11. (Kaminski, H)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/20/10 ordering plaintiff shall show cause in writing within 30 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to file an amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/25/10 ordering to the extent plaintiff is requesting additional time to file his amended complaint, that request is granted. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/5/10 ORDERING that plaintiff shall show cause in writing, within 30 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to file an amended complaint.(Dillon, M)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/22/10 ORDERING that 11 Motion to return documents is granted to the extent he seeks a return of a copy of his original exhibits; Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of his original 1 complaint, including the exhibits attached thereto; and Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order.(Dillon, M)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/6/2010 ORDERING that pltf's cmplt is DISMISSED w/ leave to amend; pltf's amended cmplt due w/in 30 days; and pltf's 7 and 9 motions for service of the cmplt are DENIED. (Yin, K)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/22/10 ORDERING the Yolo County Sheriff's Department to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Anthony R. Turner to the clerk until the balan ce of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Yolo County Sheriffs Department. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. California Forensic Medical Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony R. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Zil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodell Jencks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathrine Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?