September 30, 2013 |
Filing
73
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/30/2013 DENYING plaintiff's 52 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
|
August 20, 2013 |
Filing
70
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/20/2013 ORDERING the defendants to file a response to plaintiff's 55 motion for temporary restraining order within 30 days. (Yin, K)
|
August 16, 2013 |
Filing
69
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 08/15/2013 ADOPTING 66 Findings and Recommendations DENYING 50 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Streeter, J)
|
June 19, 2013 |
Filing
66
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/17/13 recommending that plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order 50 be denied. MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 50 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
May 9, 2013 |
Filing
61
ORDER VACATING PRIOR WRIT AND ISSUING AMENDED WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/09/13 ORDERING the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued on May 1, 2013 59 is vacated. The Custodian i s to produce Richard Manuel Burgos on 06/04/13 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD and EFB)(Plummer, M)
|
May 1, 2013 |
Filing
59
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 05/01/13 ordering the Custodian to produce Richard Manuel Burgos at 06/13/13 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD and EFB) (Plummer, M)
|
February 14, 2013 |
Filing
51
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/14/2013 ADOPTING 46 Findings and Recommendations in full; GRANTING, in part, 23 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING Plaintiff's claims relating to the denial of unlimited toilet flushes; DI SMISSING all Doe defendants; ORDERING that this action continue on Plaintiff's claims relating to the foam mattress and pillows against Defendants Capel, Clay and Haseltine; ORDERING Defendants Capel, Clay and Haseltine to file an Answer to the Plaintiff's 12 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint within 14 days. (Michel, G)
|
December 17, 2012 |
Filing
46
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/17/2012 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 23 motion to dismiss be granted in part, plaintiff' s claims relating to the denial of unlimited toilet flushes be d ismissed, the doe defendants be dismissed, and this action continue on plaintiff s claims relating to the foam mattress and pillows against defendants Capel, Clay and Haseltine; defendants Capel, Clay and Haseltine should further be directed to file an answer within 14 days of the order adopting these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
August 13, 2012 |
Filing
45
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/10/12 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 6/14/12 41 are ADOPTED in full; Plaintiff's second Motion for Preliminary Injunction 38 is DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
August 8, 2012 |
Filing
44
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/7/12 ORDERING that plaintiff may file a supplemental opposition to the motion to dismiss within 30 days from the date of this order. Defendants may file a supplemental reply within 15 days after any opposition by plaintiff is filed with the court.(Dillon, M)
|
June 14, 2012 |
Filing
41
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/14/12 ORDERING plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is denied. Plaintiff's motion for sanctions is denied. Plaintiff's motion to recus e the California Attorney General is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 38 be denied. Motion for Preliminary Injunction 38 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
December 19, 2011 |
Filing
40
AMENDED ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/16/2011 ADOPTING 32 Findings and Recommendations in full; DENYING 13 , 14 , 15 and 24 Motions for Preliminary Injunction; DENYING 37 Motion for Reconsideration as moot. (Michel, G)
|
October 27, 2011 |
Filing
36
ORDER ADOPTING 32 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/26/11 and ORDERING that plf's 13 , 14 , 15 , 24 Motions for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. (Benson, A.)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing
34
ORDER denying 33 Motion extension of time to file objections signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/30/11. (Matson, R)
|
September 2, 2011 |
Filing
32
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/1/2011 recommending that plaintiff's 13 14 15 24 motions for preliminary injunction be denied; motions referred to Judge Morrison C. England. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Duong, D)
|
August 26, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/26/11 ORDERING that the Clerk randonly assign a District Judge to this case and to update the docket accordingly. The new case number is 2:09-cv-3276 MCE CMK (PC). (Matson, R)
|
September 28, 2010 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/27/10 ORDERING that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with 30 days to file an amended complaint; Plaintiff's 2 and 7 Motions for a temporary restraining order are denied. (Dillon, M)
|