Turner v. Douglas et al

Plaintiff: Anthony R.G. Turner
Defendant: William G. Douglas, City of Woodland, Yolo County and Ed G. Prieto
Case Number: 2:2009cv03445
Filed: December 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/24/2011 ORDERING that pltf's 66 motion for appointment of counsel and an expert witness is DENIED; and pltf's 69 motion for default judgment is DENIED; and RECOMMENDING that pltf's 61 and 68 motions for summary judgment be denied; and dfts' 62 and 72 motions for summary judgment be granted. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections due w/in 21 days. (Yin, K)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/25/11 ORDERING that defendants are GRANTED 21 days from the date of this order to file a supplemental summary judgment motion. Plaintiff's summary judgment motion filed 7/18/11 is deemed timely; and defendants are GRANTED 21 days from the date of this order to file an opposition to this motion. (Kastilahn, A)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/14/11 DENYING 57 Motion to file a supplemental complaint, construed as a motion for leave to file a second amended complaint. (Dillon, M)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/06/11 denying 52 Motion to Compel, denying 53 Motion for default and denying 54 Motion for sanctions. (Plummer, M)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/10/2010 ORDERING that the 36 findings and recommendations filed October 8, 2010, are adopted in full;and For the reasons stated in the September 2, 2010 order, the following claims contained in the amended complaint are dismissed: 1) defendants Jencks, Nurse Lilly, Lisa, Genine, Carolynn and Celly Chan allegedly withheld and obstructed plaintiff's grievances; 2) defendant Jencks allegedly failed to provide plaintiff with a copy of his medical records; 3) defendant Nurse Lilly allegedly prescribed Motrin; 4) during booking, plaintiff allegedly told defendant Tony that he had been in a car accident; and 5) all claims against defendants DeSilva, Owens and Prieto.(Duong, D)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/28/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 37 motion for subpoenas is DENIED as unnecessary ; and pltf's 38 motion for declaratory judgment is DISREGARDED. (Yin, K)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J Newman on 10/7/10: Recommending that, for the reasons stated in the September 2, 2010 order, the following claims contained in the amended complaint be dismissed: 1) defendants Jencks, Nurse Lilly, Lisa, Genine, Carolynn and Celly Chan allegedly withheld and obstructed plaintiffs grievances; 2) defendant Jencks allegedly failed to provide plaintiff with a copy of his medical records; 3) defendant Nurse Lilly allegedly prescribed Motrin; 4) during booking, plaintiff allegedly told defendant Tony that he had been in a car accident; and 5) all claims against defendants DeSilva, Owens and Prieto. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one days. (Kaminski, H)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/1/2010 ORDERING that the claims, as stated in this order, are DISMISSED w/ leave to amend, w/in 30 days pltf may amend his cmplt, pltf is not obligated to amend his cmplt; at least two claims against dfts Jencks and Douglas are sufficient; the clerk to send pltf forms for service, pltf may complete the forms and return w/in 30 days, along w/ the Notice of Submission or Amendment; the 26 findings and recommendations are VACATED. (Yin, K)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/06/10 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/24/2010 ORDERING pltf to file an amended cmplt, along w/ the comnpleted Notice of Submission, w/in 21 days. (Yin, K)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 14 Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/26/2010. (Waggoner, D)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/5/2010 ORDERING pltf to submit, w/in 30 days, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; the clerk to send pltf a new ifp application.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Douglas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony R.G. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Woodland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolo County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed G. Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?