Blevins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James Duke Blevins, III
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2009cv03457
Filed: December 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sutter
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/11/11 GRANTING 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in the plaintiffs favor; The case is remanded to a different ALJ for further proceedings consistent with thisopinion. The new ALJ shall fully and fairly develop the record and shall consider all evidence in the record, including all physicians records and third party statements. CASE CLOSED. (Williams, D)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/15/2011 ORDERING that the 27 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. The Commissioner shall file his cross-motion for summary judgment within 30 days. Pltf may file a reply brief responding to Dft's arguments within 7 days of the date Dft's motion is filed. (Zignago, K.)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/21/11: Plaintiff must file a motion for summary judgment or remand within 30 days of the date of this order. The Clerk of the Court also shall serve on plaintiff the consent form used in this court. Plaintiff shall return the completed form within 30 days. (Kaminski, H)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/22/10, DENYING without prejudice 11 pltf's motion for Sharon Blevins to act as a speaker on his behalf. Pltf's 12 motion to not dismiss the case is DENIED as MOOT; and pltf's 14 motion for reinstatement of his social security benefits is DENIED without prejudice in light of the court's scheduling order in this action setting forth a briefing schedule for the parties summary judgment motions. (Kastilahn, A)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/27/2010 GRANTING 15 Motion for Extension; Defendant shall have until 5/24/2010 to file a response to plaintiff's miscellaneous motions for relief, Dckt. Nos. 11,12,14. (Matson, R)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/17/09 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; the clerk is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases; plaintiff shall submit service documents within 14 days; the USM is ordered to serve process within 60 days of this order (CC: USM). (Owen, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blevins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Duke Blevins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?