Pelletier v. Pacific Webworks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Deanna Pelletier
Defendant: Pacific Webworks, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv03503
Filed: December 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/6/12 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 63 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; DENYING 69 Motion for Judgment. Plaintiffs motion for leave is GRANTED as to claims I to VI and VIII: for violation of the CFLA, the CLRA, and the UCL, fraud in the inducement, conspiracy to commit fraud in the inducement, breach of contract, and restitution/unjust enrichment against Bloosky. It is DENIED as to claims VII and IX: restitution/unjust enric hment against defendant and violation of the EFTA. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that comports with this order within 21 days of its entry and serve defendant Bloosky Interactive, LLC with the amended complaint within 120 days of filing the amended complaint. Defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings is DENIED as to plaintiffs claim for breach of contract and DENIED AS MOOT in its remainder. (Meuleman, A)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/22/11 GRANTING Attorney Todd M. Shaughnessy's 80 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The 08/31/11 hearing on the motion is VACATED. (Benson, A.)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/7/11: The stay shall remain in place for an additional sixty (60) days from the date of this order. Counsel shall file an updated joint status report by the expiration of this extended sixty (60) day period indicating the status of settlement and effectuation thereof. Counsel shall notify the court immediately if settlement is finalized before the sixty (60) days expires. (Kaminski, H)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/3/11 GRANTING 76 Stipulation and Proposed Order; This litigation, including briefing on all pending motions and all discovery obligations, shall be stayed for a period of 60 days from the date that the Court enters an order staying this litigation; and by no later than 60 days from the date that the Court enters an order staying this litigation, the Parties shall submit a joint status report indicating the status of settlement and effectuation thereof.(Matson, R)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 11/29/2010 DENYING defendant Pacific Webworks' 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Marciel, M)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 10/12/10 ORDERING the parties agree to continue the 30 Motion for summary judgment Hearing to 11/19/10 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. (Becknal, R)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 07/15/10. Discovery pre-certification due by 11/30/2010, Discovery post certification due 09/30/11. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/17/2011. Dispositive Mot ions filed by 1/27/2012, Motions filed by 3/25/2011. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. Joint pretrial statement due 7 days prior to Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. Jury Trial set for 7/31/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (FCD) before Judge Frank C. Damrell Jr. (Williams, D) Modified on 7/16/2010 (Krueger, M).
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/7/2010 DENYING 24 Stipulation and Proposed Order to continue Motion to Compel. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelletier v. Pacific Webworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Webworks, Inc.
Represented By: Sean M Sherlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Pelletier
Represented By: Alan Himmelfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?