Lollis v. Haviland
Petitioner: Keith Lollis
Respondent: J. W. Haviland
Case Number: 2:2009cv03558
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/3/2011 ORDERING ptnr to show cause w/in 21 days why ptnr's "Marsy's Law" claim should not be stayed pending the outcome of the same claim in Gilman v. Fisher, CIV-S-05-0830 LKK GGH P; respondent may file a response to ptnr's brief w/in 7 days of service thereof. (Yin, K)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/16/11 RECOMMENDING that 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied, though petitioners Fourteenth Amendment claim is denied without prejudice as he is part of the Gilman class action. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/27/11 ORDERING that the parties have twenty-one days to provide simultaneous supplemental briefing, in light of the very recent decision noted above, demonstrating why the instant petition should not be dismissed.(Dillon, M)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/23/10 ordering petitioner shall inform the court of his current address. The clerk of the court shall serve this order on the address of record and to petitioner at California Medical Facility. (Plummer, M)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/26/10 ORDERING that parties are to submit, within 30 days, additional briefing to address Respondent's claim that the "some evidence standard" does not apply to Petitioner's claim. (Owen, K)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/9/10 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations 17 are adopted in full; and Petitioner's motion 11 for a stay pursuant to Rhines is denied. (Becknal, R)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/7/2010 ORDERING that the 16 findings and recommendations filed July 30, 2010, are adopted in full. Petitioner's 14 motion for a stay pursuant to Rhines is DENIED. (Duong, D)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/7/10 recommending that 11 MOTION to DISMISS be granted in part. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/29/10 ORDERING that within 14 days of service of this order, Petitioner shall inform the court if he wishes to proceed with a stay pursuant to King/Kelly and Re commending that Plaintiff's MOTION for a Stay pursuant to Rhines 14 be denied. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Within fourteen days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, any party may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/19/2010 ORDERING that petitioner's 2 motion to proceed IFP is DENIED as unnecessary; respondents to file a response to the petition w/in 60 days; reply due w/in 30 days of answer; if res ponse is a motion, opposition or statement of non-opposition due w/in 30 days of motion, reply due w/in 15 days thereafter; the clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General.(cc: Michael Farrell) (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lollis v. Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith Lollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. W. Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?