November 9, 2011 |
Filing
64
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/9/11 ORDERING that within 14 days from the date of this order defendant McGinness shall pay to the United States Marshal the sum of $55.00, unless within that time defendant files a written statement showing good cause for his failure to waive service. The court does not intend to extend this fourteen day period. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (cc USM) (Dillon, M)
|
May 10, 2011 |
Filing
62
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/9/11 re 61 USCA Order ORDERING that in response to the Referral, for all the foregoing reasons and for those described in detail in the Findings and Recommendations that were ultimately adopted as the order of the court, this court determines that plaintiff's 58 appeal is not taken in good faith.(Duong, D)
|
November 16, 2010 |
Filing
50
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/15/10 ORDERING plaintiff's motion for extension of time 45 is denied. Plaintiff's motion to amend 46 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint 49 is granted. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant Jacoby's motion to dismiss be denied; and this action be dismissed without leave to amend. MOTION to DISMISS 47 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 20 days. (Plummer, M)
|
October 18, 2010 |
Filing
44
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/18/10 ordering plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed. Defendant Jacoby's motion to dismiss 41 is denied. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of amendment and submit it along with an original and 1 copy of the second amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
|
September 23, 2010 |
Filing
43
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/23/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 35 motion to compel is DENIED w/out prejudice as premature. (Yin, K)
|
September 22, 2010 |
Filing
42
ORDER adopting in full 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/22/10. Dfts' 25 motion to dismiss is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Pltf's complaint against dfts McGinness, Brelji and the Sacramento County Sheriff's Dept is DISMISSED. Pltf's complaint against dft Jacoby is DISMISSED with LEAVE to amend. Pltf is GRANTED 30 days to file an amended complaint against dft Jacoby. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 9/14/10 denying 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(Dillon, M)
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing
34
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/24/2010 ORDERING that a district judge be assigned to this case; and RECOMMENDING that dfts' 25 motion to dimiss be granted in part and denied in part; pltf& #039;s cmplt against all dfts except dft Jacoby be dismissed; and pltf's cmplt against dft Jacoby be dismissed w/out prejudice and that pltf be granted 30 days, after adoption of these F&R to file an amended cmplt. Assigned and Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
August 11, 2010 |
Filing
32
ORDER denying 30 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/10/10. (Kaminski, H)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing
26
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 7/20/10 denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(Dillon, M)
|
June 10, 2010 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 6/8/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 18 motion to supplement his 12/31/09 cmplt is DENIED. (Yin, K)
|
May 7, 2010 |
Filing
15
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/6/2010 DENYING w/out prejudice, pltf's 13 request for five subpoenas. (Yin, K)
|
March 30, 2010 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 3/29/10 DIRECTING USM to serve Complaint filed on 12/31/09 on John McGinness, Brelji, Jacoby, Sacramento County Sheriff's Dept within 10 days. Clerk to serve pltf with a copy of the local rules. (Owen, K)
|
February 17, 2010 |
Filing
8
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 2/16/10 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Kenneth Knanishu to the clerk until the balance of $350 is pai d in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/14/10 ORDERING that 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is DISMISSED without prejudice; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. (Dillon, M)
|