February 21, 2012 |
Filing
49
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 2/16/2012 RECOMMENDING that Bank of America's motion to dismiss # 25 be granted; and this action be dismissed without leave to amended; Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections due within 20 days after being served with these F & R's.(Reader, L)
|
December 9, 2011 |
Filing
46
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/8/11; On October 27, 2011, plaintiff filed a request for a court date. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status conference will be held on January 12, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom # 26. Should any party wish to appear telephonically, they shall contact courtroom deputy Jonathan Anderson at (916) 930-4072 to make arrangements.(Matson, R)
|
April 22, 2011 |
Filing
32
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/21/11 ORDERING that the hearing date of 4/28/11 is vacated. Hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss is continued to 6/9/11 at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom no. 26; Plaintiff shall file opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss, no later than 5/26/11. Failure to file opposition and appear at the hearing will be deemed as a statement of non-opposition and shall result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b).(Becknal, R)
|
January 4, 2011 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 01/03/11 ORDERING that the 20 F&Rs are VACATED; the Status Conference is CONTINUED to 04/14/11 at 11:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds; Clerk to forward plf's instructions for service, the completed summons, copies of the complaint and this order to the USM; USM is directed to notify dft Bank of America of the commencement of this action and to request a waiver of service. (Benson, A.)
|
December 10, 2010 |
Filing
20
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/09/10 RECOMMENDING that this action be Dismissed without Prejudice. Objections to F&R's due within 14 days. (Williams, D)
|
October 15, 2010 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/14/10 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff 1 USM-285 form, along with an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed January 19, 2010; Within twenty days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete and submit the attached Notice of Submission of Documents to the court, with the documents listed in the Order. Status Conference re-set for 1/6/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26 before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Williams, D)
|
April 2, 2010 |
Filing
10
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 3/30/2010 ORDERING that the Status Conference set for 6/3/2010 at 11:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. The Clerk shall send plaintiffs copies (one for each de fendant plus one for plaintiffs) of the form, "Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge," with this order. Plaintiffs shall serve on each defendant, within ten days after the service of process, a copy of this order and a copy of the form "Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge" and shall file with the clerk a certificate reflecting such service.. (Duong, D)
|
March 30, 2010 |
Filing
9
ORDER AND ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY THE US MARSHAL signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 3/29/10: Clerk is directed to forward the instructions for service of process, the completed summons, copies of the complaint and copies of this order to the US Marshal. Within 10 days from the date of this order, the US Marshal is directed to notify dft Bank of America Home Loans and Wilbert Thompson of the commencement of this action.(Carlos, K)
|
March 4, 2010 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 3/3/2010, ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to return the copy of the complaint submitted by pltf on February 24, 2010. Within 30 days, pltf shall submit to the court one summons for each dft to effect service.(Kastilahn, A)
|
February 17, 2010 |
Filing
3
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 2/16/10 ORDERING the plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; plaintiffs shall complete w/i 30 days the attached notice of submission; 1 summons for each dft; 1 USM-285 form for each dft; and 3 copies of the cmp; upon receipt of above-described docments, the Court will direct the USM to served dfts. (Becknal, R)
|