Gardner v. McDonal
Petitioner: Larry Augustus Gardner
Respondent: Mike McDonal
Case Number: 2:2010cv00142
Filed: January 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 9/17/10 RECOMMENDING that 14 Motion to Dismiss be granted; this action be dismissed re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and the district court decline to issue a certificate of appealability. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/11/2010 ORDERING that, w/in 30 days, petitioner to file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to the motion to dismiss; failure to comply will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Yin, K)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/26/10 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 45 days. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. Petitioner's 2 and 4 Motions to Proceed IFP are GRANTED. (cc Michael Farrell)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner v. McDonal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Augustus Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike McDonal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?