Green v. Goldy et al
Plaintiff: John K. Green
Defendant: Goldy and C.D.C.R. Director
Case Number: 2:2010cv00162
Filed: January 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/25/12 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/21/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motions for leave to file a supplemental complaint 56 & 60 are denied without prejudice to raising the claims in a separate cause of action; Plaintiffs motion for a second settlement conference 57 is denied; Plaintiffs motion for leave to use defendant Goldys confidential settlement conference statement as evidence 58 is denied; and Plaintiffs motions for relief related to Sergeant K. Gillespies witness testimony 59 & 62 are denied. (Dillon, M)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/20/2011 DENYING pltf's 51 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/15/11 ORDERING the Custodian to produce John K. Green at 9:00 am on October 25, 2011 in Courtroom 25 before Judge Kendal J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Dillon, M)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, in full, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 7/9/2011. Defendant Goldy's 27 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. (Marciel, M)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/13/11 ORDERING plaintiff's motion to compel 28 be denied. The clerk of the court is directed to randomly assign a United States District Judge to this actio n. U.S. District Judge Garland E. Burrell randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant Goldy's motion for summary judgment 27 be denied. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 27 referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/13/2011 DENYING pltf's 35 motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/12/10. (Plummer, M)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of John K. Green signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/19/2010. CDC is to collect monthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Goldy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John K. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.D.C.R. Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?