Stephenson v. Martel et al
Plaintiff: Robert E. Stephenson
Defendant: M. Martel, M. Cate, N. Grannis, D.B. Long, L. Olivas, Machado, E. Palubicki, G.R. Wilson and E. Whitehead
Case Number: 2:2010cv00238
Filed: January 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/18/2013 VACATING the 4/11/13 order to show cause; Judgment is entered for defendants pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(f); and this case is CLOSED. (Yin, K)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/11/13 ordering plaintiff's motion for a settlement conference 70 is denied. Plaintiff's request to reopen discovery is denied. Plaintiff's motion for the production of incarcera ted witnesses 71 is granted in regards to Ira Parthemore and denied in all other respects, but no order for production will issue at this time. Plaintiff is directed to show cause within 28 days from the date of this order why summary judgment sho uld not be entered for defendants in light of plaintiff's failure to meet his burden of proof on his 8th Amendment claim. Plaintiff's brief shall be limited to 5 pages and should address only his evidence of the defendants' deliberate indiference to a know safety threeat. Although not required, defendants may file a reply brief, also should not exceed 5 pages. (Plummer, M)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/26/2012 GRANTING plaintiff's 65 motion for an extension of time; plaintiff has 30 days to file objections to the 10/25/2012 order; the 3/11/2013 trial date is VACATED, the court will reset the trial date after resolution of plaintiff's objections to the pretrial order. (Yin, K)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/27/12 ORDERING that plaintiff shall file a pretrial statement within 14 days or else this case will be dismissed. (Dillon, M)
March 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/31/2012. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 32 is granted only as to defendants Cate and Grannis who are dismissed from this action; the motion is denied in all other respects and this action continues against the remaining defendants; Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment 41 is denied; The findings and recommendations filed October 26, 2011 48 , are adopted in full. (Andrews, P)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/21/12 denying 52 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/25/11 ORDERING that a district judge be assigned to this case; RECOMMENDING that 32 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted only fordefendants Cate and Granni s who should be dismissed from this action, but the motion should be denied in all other respects; and 41 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be denied. The undersigned will issue a further scheduling order if these findings and recommendations are adopted. Motions referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/24/11 ORDERING that plaintiffs 20 motion for a meet and confer is DENIED as moot; Plaintiffs 27 request for six subpoenas is DENIED; Plaintiffs 19 motion to modify the scheduling order is DENIED; Defendants 30 motion to modify the scheduling order is GRANTED and pretrial motions must be filed no later than 4/1/11. (Dillon, M)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/8/10, ORDERING that discovery must be completed and any motions to compel must be filed NO LATER than January 10, 2011. (Kastilahn, A)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 05/12/10 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to issue and send plaintiff 9 summonses for defendants Martel, Cate, Grannis, Long, Olivas, Machado, Palubicki, Wilson and Whitehead. The cle rk shall also send plaintiff 10 copies of the form "Consent to Proceed before United States Magistrate Judge" with this order. Plaintiff shall complete service of process within 60 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order and a copy of the form "Consent to Proceed before United States Magistrate Judge" on each defendant at the time the summons and complaint are served. Plaintiff's status report shall be filed within 90 days from the date of this order. Defendants' status report shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. The clerk of the court shall serve upon plaintiff a copy of the local rules of court. (Plummer, M)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/2/10 ORDERING that within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall either file an informa pauperis affidavit or a short declaration stating his intention to serve the complaint himself; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis for a prisoner.(Dillon, M)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/16/10 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson v. Martel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.B. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Palubicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?