Edwards v. Grannis et al
Plaintiff: David Edwards
Defendant: N. Grannis, John Haviland, V. Singh, D. Harley, Peck, Koelling, Martinez, Busig, Brown and - Sandy
Case Number: 2:2010cv00298
Filed: February 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/30/2011 GRANTING defendant's 35 motion to strike plaintiff's 11/7/11 response to defendant's reply. (Yin, K)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/10/2011 ORDERING the clerk to assign a US District Judge; and RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 27 motion for summary judgment be denied; and defendant Peck's 30 motion for summary judgment be granted. Assigned and Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/27/11 ordering that plaintiff's opposition is construed as a motion for protective order and so construed 24 is denied. (Plummer, M)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DISCOVERY ORDER and SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/15/11 ORDERING Discovery due by 7/29/2011; all pretrial motions shall be filed on or before 10/21/11; and pretrial conference and trial dates will be set, as appropriate, following adjudication of any dispositive motion or the expiration of time for filing such a motion. (Carlos, K)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/02/10 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff 1 summons, 1 USM-285 form, instruction sheet and a copy of the 04/06/10 amended complaint to be completed and returned within 60 days. (Plummer, M)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/12/10 DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP without prejudice; Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order a properly completed in forma pauperis application that includes a certi fied copy of plaintiffs prison trust account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint in this action and a prison officials certification; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner for use in a civil rights action. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Grannis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Harley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koelling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Busig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Sandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?