Smith v. National City Mortgage et al
Defendant: National City Mortgage and Kondaur Capital Corp.
Petitioner: William A Smith
Case Number: 2:2010cv00359
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/23/12 re 79 Motion for Summary Judgment or, alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment filed by National City Mortgage. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part as stated within this order. (Meuleman, A)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/17/12 ORDERING that Defendant's Request to Strike is DENIED; and Defendant's MOTION to preclude expert testimony 63 is GRANTED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/18/2012 ORDERING 72 Motion Hearing to preclude expert witness testimony of plaintiff set for 7/5/2012 at 11:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom, before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds; joint statement disagreement pursuant to Rule 251 due within 5 days from the date of the entry of this order. (Reader, L)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/8/2012 70 Defendant PNC Bank, National Association, as successor by merger to National City Bank (previously doing business as "National City Mortgage") is hereby be permitted to resume the deposition of plaintiff William Allen Smith on 6/13/2012. (Reader, L)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/13/12 GRANTING 57 Stipulation to continue expert disclosure under Pre-trial Scheduling Order and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 26. The initial expert disclosure date is extended to 5/14/12; supplemental and any rebuttal experts extended to 5/28/12. (Meuleman, A)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/19/2011 GRANTING 42 Plaintiff's Application to serve the California Secretary of State. (Reader, L)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/11/2011 GRANTING 34 Motion to Dismiss the second, third, sixth, and eighth claims in the Second Amended Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant PNC's Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/29/10. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. (Kaminski, H)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/7/2010 ORDERING 5 , 6 Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, hearings reset for 8/18/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. National City Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William A Smith
Represented By: Piotr Gabriel Reysner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kondaur Capital Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?