Bank of the West v. M/V Sand Dollar, et al
Plaintiff: |
Bank of the West |
Defendant: |
Erich C Bauer and M/V Sand Dollar, Official No. 10586060, Hull No. CIR30024L596 |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv00363 |
Filed: |
February 11, 2010 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Sacramento |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Presiding Judge: |
Lawrence K. Karlton |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Marine |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 3, 2011 |
Filing
74
JUDGMENT of FORECLOSURE of Preferred Ship Mortgage dated *11/3/11* signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/3/2011 ORDERING that the First Preferred Ship Mortgage in favor of Bank of the West, against the dft M/V Sand Dollar, Official No. 10586 06 is forclosed thereby foreclosing out all other liens, claims and interest subordinate thereto. The Clerk issue payment from the sume deposited by the USM pursuant to the sale of the Vessel, in the sume of $6,000, payable to Bank of the West, sent c/o Paul N. Balestracci, Neumiller & Beardslee, PO Box 20, Stockton, CA 95201-3020. CASE CLOSED. (Duong, D) cc: CFS Modified on 11/3/2011 (Duong, D).
|
October 18, 2010 |
Filing
46
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/15/10: Counsel for defendants M/V Sand Dollar and Erich Bauer is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order why sanctions of $150 should not issue as permitted by Local Rule 110, and why a default judgment should not be entered against the defendants. The status conference scheduled for October 18, 2010 is vacated. (Kaminski, H)
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/27/2010 ORDERING 27 Status Conference reset for 9/20/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; the parties are directed to file status reports 14 days prior to the status conference. (Reader, L)
|
May 25, 2010 |
Filing
39
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/25/10 GRANTING 35 Ex Parte Application re: Place and Manner of Publication. (Williams, D)
|
April 28, 2010 |
Filing
33
SECOND AMENDED ORDER of 25 signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/2010 re 28 31 ORDERING that The Clerk of the District Court shall prepare a Warrant for the Arrest of the VESSEL and shall deliver it with a copy of this Order to the U SM for service. the USM is authorized to secure and remove the VESSEL from the real property and to take possession of any trailer or other vehicle or conveyance on which the VESSELL rests on, is attached to, or can otherwise be used to move or transport the VESSEL. (cc USM)(Duong, D)
|
April 7, 2010 |
Filing
25
AMENDED ORDER re 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/6/10: The Clerk of the District Court shall immediately prepare a Warrant for the Arrest of the VESSEL and shall deliver it with a copy of this Order to the USM for service. (Kaminski, H)
|
February 18, 2010 |
Filing
17
AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/18/10 APPOINTING substitute custodian and for AUTHORIZATION for movement of defendants vessel. (cc USM) (Donati, J)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?