Best Buy Stores, L.P. v. Manteca Lifestyle Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Defendant: Manteca Lifestyle Center, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv00389
Filed: February 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER on Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of Action With Prejudice 218 signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/2/2012. Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/7/2012 DENYING 170 Motion to Compel. (Michel, G)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/30/12 GRANTING defendant's 175 Request to Appear Telephonically at the 06/07/12 hearing on the Motion to Compel. Defendant's counsel, Rita M. Aliss Powers and Marc B. Koenigsberg, may appear at the hearing by telephone. (Benson, A.)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION and ORDER Re Motions in Limine and Trial Evidence 176 signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/30/2012. (See document for details.)(Kirksey Smith, K)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/16/12 re 170 MOTION to COMPEL: The parties are HEREBY ORDERED to specifically address the following issues in their Joint Statement re Discovery Disagreement: (1) whether the parties agree tha t defendant was entitled to serve discovery requests and a deposition notice without leave of court and is entitled to pursue its motion to compel outside of the close of discovery; and (2) what "manifest injustice" justifies permitting def endant to conduct additional discovery on the eve of trial, as required by the Second Amended Final Pretrial Order. The court expects that the parties will present clearer and more complete, but nevertheless efficient, picture of the procedural history than was presented in the notice of motion and motion. (Meuleman, A)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/25/12 denying without prejudice 164 Motion to Compel. (Matson, R)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/24/2012: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions in limine upon which the parties require a ruling before the commencement of trial will be heard on 6/12/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge Wil liam B. Shubb. Jury selection will begin on 6/14/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. The trial will begin with opening statements and the testimony of witnesses on 6/19/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (See document for further details.) (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/16/12 denying 73 Motion to exclude plaintiff's experts and denying 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kaminski, H)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 AMENDED 114 ORDER re Requests to Seal signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/13/2012. All outstanding Motions to Seal documents are DENIED for reasons that moving parties have not made requisite showing that documents sought to be sealed are privileged. This Order supersedes Courts previous 2/8/2012 114 Order. (Marciel, M)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 2/7/12; Defendant's Request to Seal Documents in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 76), Defendant's Request to Seal Documents in Support of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Pl aintiff's Experts (Docket No 74), and Plaintiff's Request to Seal Exhibits to Declarations of Rebecka M. Biejo and Paul Waazan in Support of Best Buy's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Experts (Docket N o. 96) are hereby DENIED, for the reasons that the moving parties have not made the requisite showing that the documents sought to be sealed are privileged or that the need to keep the public from seeing them outweighs the administrative hassle or the confusion that might be created in attempting to place and maintain such documents under seal.(Matson, R)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying 55 Motion for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/23/12. (Matson, R)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/16/11 re 79 ORDERING that the Amended Joint Stipulation is approved. The hearing date for Manteca's 75 Motion for Summary Judgment and Manteca's 73 Motion to Exclude Plaint iff's Experts be continued until March 12, 2012. The date of the Final Pretrial Conference shall be April 16, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5 at which time a settlement conference will be set, as stated in the prior Scheduling Order. The Trial date is scheduled for June 12, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. (Duong, D)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT-OFF signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/2/11. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 JOINT STIPULATION 69 and ORDER to amend the 11/12/2010 Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/20/11. (Kastilahn, A)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/29/2011 AMENDING 29 Protective Order. (Michel, G)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/25/11 ORDERING that by close of business on Friday, 9/2/11, defendant Manteca is ordered to produce all communications between Manteca and its tenants responsive to the topics addressed in this order. Defendant's 55 motion for protective order, or, in the alternative, to quash the subpoenas is taken under SUBMISSION. Judge Newman will preside over another informal telephonic conference at 2 p.m. on Thursday, 9/22/11, if necessary. Each party shall FILE a short letter brief regarding the discovery dispute by 5 p.m. on Tuesday, 9/20/11. (Kastilahn, A)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/3/2011 ORDERING that the 37 Amended Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: The deadline for the parties to disclose experts and produce reports in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedu re 26(a)(2) shall be extended from July 29, 2011, to August 12, 2011. The deadline for the parties to disclose rebuttal experts and produce rebuttal expert reports shall be extended from August 26, 2011, to September 9, 2011. 3. The deadline to comp lete all discovery shall be extended from September 30, 2011, to October 31, 2011, with all motions to compel to be heard no later than October 31, 2011. All other deadlines are to remain unchanged. Plaintiff's request for leave to take more t han ten depositions is DENIED without prejudice at this time. By close of business on Monday, August 8, 2011, defendant is ordered to complete its document production in its entirety. By close of business on Friday, August 12, 2011, plaintiff is ord ered to complete its document production in its entirety. The hearing currently set for August 25, 2011, regarding Defendant's 55 Motion For Protective Order shall remain on calendar. Counsel may appear telephonically at the hearing, but must make arrangements for telephonic appearance by contacting the undersigned's courtroom deputy. Counsel may also stipulate that the hearing be taken off calendar and may instead request another informal telephonic conference.(Duong, D)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/13/2011 ORDERING pltf's motion to compel production of all privileged documents responsive to RFP Nos. 18-20, is DENIED without prejudice; at this time, the court DECLINES to find that the privilege has been waived with respect to these RFP's; pltf's motion to compel dft to produce documents responsive to RFP No. 33 is GRANTED; pltf's motion to compel documents responsive to RFP No. 36 is GRANTED; dft shall have 30 days from the date of this order to produce the responsive documents; pltf's motion to compel documents responsive to RFP Nos. 37-38 is DENIED; pltf's motion to compel the production of documents responsive to RFP No. 54 (as narrowed and described herein) and RFP No. 55 is GRANTED; dft shall have 30 days from the date of this order to produce the responsive documents; both parties' requests for monetary sanctions in connection with this motion are DENIED. (Reader, L)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/6/11 GRANTING 49 & 50 Request to Appear Telephonically. Attorney Amy Churan and Howard Jeruchimowitz shall appear telephonically at the 41 Motion to Compel hearing set for 6/9/11 at 10:00 a.m. (Donati, J)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/13/2011 GRANTING 42 Plaintiffs leave of Court to file a First Amended Complaint in this litigation and for Defendant to file a response within 28 calendar days thereafter.(Reader, L)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 03/03/11 AMENDING the Scheduling Order as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 07/29/11 with any rebuttal disclosures due 08/26/11; Discovery due by 09/30/11; Motions filed by 12/01/11; Final Pretrial Conference set for 01/23/12 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb and Trial set for 03/27/12 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. (Benson, A.)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REVISED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/12/2010. (Waggoner, D)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/20/10 ORDERING that the parties' "Stipulated Protective Order" is not approved. (Becknal, R)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 8 dft's Motion to Dismiss, signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/12/10. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best Buy Stores, L.P. v. Manteca Lifestyle Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Aaron Geibelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manteca Lifestyle Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?