Lowrie et al v. Alliance Bancorp et al
Plaintiff: Carina Lowrie and Clifford Lowrie, Jr.
Defendant: Alliance Bancorp, Mortgage Electronic Registration Services (MERS), Paradise Mortgage Corporation, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and California Reconveyance Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv00468
Filed: February 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER 32 for Dismissal signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/26/2010. This action is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41 (a). (Marciel, M)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/21/10, ORDERING that counsel for pltf shall file an affidavit, which states that the sanction was paid personally by counsel. Counsel for dft PMC is SANCTIONED in the amt of $250; to be paid to the Clerk no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Counsel shall file an affidavit accompanying the payment of this sanction which states that it is paid personally by counsel.(Kastilahn, A)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/14/10 ORDERING the motion to dismiss 18 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as moot; the hearing set for 6/21/10 is hereby VACATED. (Carlos, K)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 05/17/10 ORDERING Counsel for Plaintiffs and Counsel for Defendant to SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 days, why sanctions should not issue in accordance with Local Rule 110, including a fine of $250.00. The status conference set for May 17, 2010 at 11:30 a.m. is vacated. The court SETS a further status conference for July 19, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. (Williams, D)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/26/10 ORDERING 5 Motion for TRO Hearing is set for 3/22/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Defendants opposition due by 3/8/10. Plantiffs reply due by 3/15/10. The court further ORDERS that plaintiffs shall serve their complaint, ex parte motion and this order upon defendants by 3/1/10. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowrie et al v. Alliance Bancorp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carina Lowrie
Represented By: Stephen C. Ruehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Lowrie, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen C. Ruehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Services (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?