Chon, et al v. Downey Savings and Loan, et al
Plaintiff: Chae Chon and Yung Chon
Defendant: Downey Savings and Loan Association, F.A. and Central Mortgage Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv00509
Filed: March 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/7/11 ORDERING the Court remands the case to Superior Court of the State of California, County of Sacramento. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 26 is DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Copy of remand order sent to Superior Court. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/7/2010 ORDERING that Dft's 18 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Pltfs TILA claim is DISMISSED without leave to amend. Pltfs may file an amended complaint as to their remaining causes of action within 20 days. (Zignago, K.)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/20/10 ORDERING that dft's 11 Motion to Dismiss plf's complaint is GRANTED w/leave to amend. Dft's motion to Expunge the Lis Pendens is DENIED. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint not later than 20 days after the date this Memorandum and Order is filed electronically. If no amended complaint is filed w/i said 20-day period, without further notice, plfs' claims will be dismissed without leave to amend. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chon, et al v. Downey Savings and Loan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chae Chon
Represented By: John Steve Sargetis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yung Chon
Represented By: John Steve Sargetis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downey Savings and Loan Association, F.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mortgage Company
Represented By: William Guy Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?