Z.F., et al v. Ripon Unified School District, et al
Plaintiff: Z. F., M. A. F., J. F., L. H., J. H., J. R. H., J. A., A. N., G. N. and M. R.
Defendant: Ripon Unified School District, Ripon Unified School District Board of Trustees, San Joaquin County Office of Education, Valley Mountain Regional Center, Modesto City Schools, Modesto City Schools Board of Education, Tara Sisemore-Hester, Virginia Johnson and Sue Swartzlander
Case Number: 2:2010cv00523
Filed: March 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 316 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/31/17: Counter-complaint 21 is dismissed as to the sole remaining Counter-Defendant M.A.F. in its entirety, with prejudice, and without costs to either party as to the counterclaims alleged therein. (Kaminski, H)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 312 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/1/17 ORDERING that the plaintiffs' 308 Motion is RESET to 8/24/17 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley.(Becknal, R)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 JUDGMENT dated *6/14/2017* in favor of VMRC and RUSD Defendants against Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs Z.F., A.N., and their respective parents pursuant to order signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/13/2017. (Washington, S)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/2/2017 ORDERING the parties to file a Joint Status Report by 6/12/2017. (Michel, G.)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/5/2017 ORDERING that VMRC and RUSD Defendants' separate 242 , 250 Motions for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Section 504 claim are hereby GRANTED. VMRC's 242 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Unruh Act claim is hereby GRANTED. RUSD Defendants 250 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' ADA claim is hereby GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/31/2017 GRANTING 258 Motion for Summary Judgment in favor of the counterdefendants on the counterclaim for libel and the counterclaim for slander; DENYING the counterdefendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on all other grounds; ORDERING the parties to file a Joint Status Report within thirty (30) days. (Michel, G.)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/20/17 ORDERING that the Court AWARDS Plaintiffs the $107,940 lodestar for reasonable attorneys' fees. (Kastilahn, A)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 273 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/25/2014 ORDERING that pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) and 41(c)(2) by and between Counter-Claimants Valley Mountain Regional Center, Tara Sisemore-Hester and Richard Jacobs and Counter-Defendant J.A., though their respective counsel of record, that Counter-Claimants' entire 21 counter-complaint is DISMISSED as to J.A. only in its entirety, with prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/9/2014 plaintiffs' 230 Motion to Amend 205 Pretrial Scheduling Order. The Expert Disclosure deadline is EXTENDED 30 days from date of Order approving the Settlement. (Marciel, M)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/22/14 ORDERING that the non-expert discovery deadline is EXTENDED until July 31, 2014 for the limited purpose of conducting the depositions of Tara Sisemore-Hester and J.A. only. (Kastilahn, A)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/16/14 extending the non-expert discovery deadline until July 16, 2014 for the limited purpose of conducting the depositions of M.A.F.; J.A.; Shirley Nutt; J.F.; and Tara Sisemore-Hester only. (Kaminski, H)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/21/13 DENYING 152 Motion to Certify Class and 164 Motion for Joinder. (Meuleman, A)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/21/12: Status Conference RESET for 11/26/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. (Kaminski, H)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATION and ORDER 166 signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 7/2/12 ORDERING that based on the parties stipulation, Defendants' Responses/Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification will now be due on 8/16/12. Plaintiffs' Reply will be due on 8/30/12. Oral argument is scheduled to commence at 9:00 a.m. on 9/10/12. (Kastilahn, A)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/29/12: Cross-complainants failed to respond to the September 29, 2011 Order. Therefore, cross-defendant Autism Reform California is dismissed from this action without prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 3/15/2012 ORDERING 147 the 8/16/2012 date to amend the complaint to add "Doe" defendants and move for Class Certification is VACATED; Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Cert ification and Doe Defendant Amendments are due on 6/18/2012; Defendants' Responses/Oppositions to the Motions for Class Certification and Doe Defendants are due on 8/2/2012; Plaintiffs' Reply is due on 8/16/2012; Oral argument is scheduled to commence at 9:00 a.m. on 9/10/2012. (Reader, L)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/24/11 ORDERING dates for Initial Disclosures and Amending Complaint to add 'Doe' defendants to be VACATED. Initial Disclosures shall be made on or before 12/15/11 and date to add 'Doe' defendants is extended to 4/16/12. (Meuleman, A)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/28/2011 ORDERING Plaintiff shall file a motion for class certification no later than 4/16/2012; this motion shall be noticed for hearing on the Court's earliest available regularly scheduled law and motion hearing date. Further Status Conference set for 8/6/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Reader, L)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 9/9/11 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' claim under Title III of the ADA is DISMISSED with prejudice, and the J.H. Plaintiffs' § 1983 claim alleging a violation of the right of instrastate travel is DISMISSED with prejudice. VMRC's 121 motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Unruh Act claim is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/2/11 ORDERING the Counterdefendants' dismissal motion is granted in part and denied in part, and their anti-SLAPP motion is denied. The precise rulings are as follows: M.A.F. and J.A.'s requ est to dismiss Counterclaimants' malicious prosecution claim is granted; Counterdefendants' request to dismiss Counterclaimants' libel claim is denied; Counterdefendants' request to dismiss Counterclaimants' slander claim is granted, except as to the statements in the Examiner.com article, to which this request is granted as to J.A. but denied as to M.A.F. and SNAFU; and Counterdefendants' anti-SLAPP motion to strike is denied. (Becknal, R)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 01/27/11 DENYING Modesto City Schools 37 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING Ripon Defendats' 42 Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part VMRC's 24 Motion to Dismiss, VMRC's motion to dismiss claim under Title III of the ADA is GRANTED and its motion under the Unruh Act is DENIED ; GRANTING Johnson, Swartzlander, VMRC, Sisemore-Hester and Jacobs 35 Motion to Dismiss ; Plaintiffs are granted fourteen (14) days from the date on which this order is filed to file a Second Amended Complaint addressing the deficiencies in any dismissed claim. (Williams, D)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/29/10 ORDERING the 12/13/10 Joint Status Conference is Vacated; the Pretrial Scheduling Conference is reset for 2/28/11 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr; a joint status report shall be filed 14 days prior to the hearing. (Becknal, R)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/23/10 ORDERING that 2:10-CV-00523-FCD-EFB is reassigned to the undersigned judge and Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in the reassi gned case are VACATED; the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall show the initials GEB-JFM next to the action number. The Clerk of Court shall make an appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment and shall issue Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.'s Order Setting Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference in 2:10-CV-00523-GEB-JFM setting a status conference. (Becknal, R)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 7/1/10 ORDERING dfts Ripon Unified School District, Ripon Unified School District Board of Trustees and San Joaquin County Office of Education shall have until 8/9/10 to file a responsive pleading to pltfs' First Amended Complaint 6 . (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Z.F., et al v. Ripon Unified School District, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ripon Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ripon Unified School District Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin County Office of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Mountain Regional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modesto City Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modesto City Schools Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Sisemore-Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Swartzlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. F.
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. A. F.
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. F.
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. H.
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. H.
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. R. H.
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. A.
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. N.
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. N.
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. R.
Represented By: Tamara Lynn Loughrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?