Munns et al v. Clinton et al

Plaintiff: Mark Munns, Crista Munns, Dennis Debrabander, Sharon Debrabander and Lori Silveri
Defendant: Hillary Diane Rodham Clinton and Jennifer Foo
Case Number: 2:2010cv00681
Filed: March 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/9/15: Plaintiffs' due process and takings claims are hereby SEVERED from the remainder of this case. The Clerk of the Court is directed to TRANSFER those claims to the United States Court of Federal Claims and to close this case. (Kaminski, H)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/20/2012 ORDERING Lloyd's and CAN Financial are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(I), and the Clerk is direced to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Waggoner, D)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/27/2012 GRANTING. without leave to amend, 46 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's 43 First Amended Complaint. This action will proceed on Plaintiffs remaining claims against the Insurance Defendants. Defendants United States of America, Hillary Diane Rodham Clinton and Jennifer Foo TERMINATED. (Michel, G)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/18/2012 ORDERING that presently before the Court is the a 45 stipulation filed by Plaintiffs and Defendant United States requesting an extension of the deadline to confer under Federal Rule of Civ il Procedure 26(f) and to submit a joint status report. For good cause shown, the time for the parties to confer under Rule 26 (f) and to submit a joint status report shall be extended until sixty (60) days from the resolution of the United States' anticipated motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/29/2011 ORDERING plaintiff's 37 Motion to Strike and 38 Request for Judicial Notice are DENIED; defendant's 19 Motion to Dismiss and 21 Motion to Dismiss are GRANTED with leave to amend; not later than 45 days following the date of this order, plaintiff may file an amended complaint; if no amended complaint is filed, this action will be dismissed with prejudice. (Waggoner, D)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/27/11 ORDERING 19 , 21 Motions to Dismiss Hearings RESET for 6/23/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Meuleman, A)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER 26 signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 4/11/11, ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Oppositions to the Motions to Dismiss shall be filed with this Court no later than April 11, 2011. (Kastilahn, A)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/22/10: The court finds that no sanction is appropriate.(Kastilahn, A)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/26/2010 ORDERING 5 Counsel for plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing why sanctions should not issue in accordance with LR 110, including a fine of $150 and/or dismissal of th is case within 14 days of the issuance of this order. Pltf shall serve dfts within 15 days from the date of this order. Further Status Conference reset for 8/2/2010 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. Parties shall file status reports 14 days prior to the status conference. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munns et al v. Clinton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Munns
Represented By: William Wayne Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crista Munns
Represented By: William Wayne Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Debrabander
Represented By: William Wayne Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Debrabander
Represented By: William Wayne Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Silveri
Represented By: William Wayne Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary Diane Rodham Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Foo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?