Jackson et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Charles S. Jackson and Lucille Jackson
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv00711
Filed: March 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/1/11: Discovery shall be completed BY 6/15/2012. Designation of Expert Witnesses is due BY 8/15/2012. Plaintiffs' dispositive motion shall be filed BY 10/18/2012, defenda nts' opposition and cross-motion (if any) is due BY 11/8/2012, plaintffs' reply and opposition to cross-motion is due BY 11/21/2012, and defendants' reply is due BY 12/6/2012. Hearing on such motions shall be on 12/13/2012 at 2:00 p.m . The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 2/21/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. A joint final pretrial conf statement is due BY 1/31/2013. Trial briefs are DUE no later than 2/7/2013. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed BY 1/31/2013, oppositions must be filed BY 2/7/2013, and any reply must be filed BY 2/14/2013. A Bench Trial is SET for 4/15/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 02/08/11 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 25 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 24) is GRANTED without further leave to amend as to Claims 4, 5, 6 and 7, and DENIED as to Claims 1, 2, and 3. Defendants Motion to Expunge the Lis Pendens is DENIED without prejudice. The parties are to file a joint status report within 30 days of this Order being electronically filed. (Williams, D)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/16/2010 GRANTING Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC's request to appear telephonically at the Motion to Dismiss hearing scheduled for 12/2/2010 at 2:00 PM. (Zignago, K.)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/20/10 ORDERING that dft's 9 Motion to Dismiss plf's first amended complaint is GRANTED w/leave to amend. Dft's motion to Expunge the Lis Pendens is DENIED w/o prejudice. Plaintif fs may file an amended complaint not later than 20 days after the date this Memorandum and Order is filed electronically. If no amended complaint is filed w/i said 20-day period, without further notice, plfs' claims will be dismissed without leave to amend. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles S. Jackson
Represented By: Deborah J. Pimentel, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Jackson
Represented By: Deborah J. Pimentel, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?